EP1663481 - NANOSCALE GOLD CATALYSTS, ACTIVATING AGENTS, SUPPORT MEDIA, AND RELATED METHODOLOGIES USEFUL FOR MAKING SUCH CATALYST SYSTEMS ESPECIALLY WHEN THE GOLD IS DEPOSITED ONTO THE SUPPORT MEDIA USING PHYSICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREY, Larry, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
WOOD, Thomas, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
BUCCELLATO, Gina, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
JONES, Marvin, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
CHAMBERLAIN, Craig, S. P.O. 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
SIEDLE, Allen, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04784916.1 | 23.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US31265 | Priority number, date | US20030506623P | 26.09.2003 Original published format: US 506623 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005030382 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1663481 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663481 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/52, B01J23/66, B01J35/10, B01J35/02, B01J37/34, B01J37/02, B01J21/18, B01J21/04, B01J21/06, B01D53/86 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B01J23/52 (EP,KR,US);
A62D3/38 (US);
A62D9/00 (EP,US);
B01D53/44 (US);
B01D53/62 (US);
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J21/02 (KR);
B01J21/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/18 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/66 (EP,US);
B01J35/23 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/393 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/0238 (EP,US);
B01J37/347 (EP,US);
B01J37/349 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B01D2255/106 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP,US);
B01J23/02 (EP,US);
B01J37/0248 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S977/90 (EP,US);
Y10S977/903 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOSKALIGE GOLDKATALYSATOREN, AKTIVIERUNGSMITTEL, TRÄGERMEDIEN UND VERWANDTE METHODOLOGIEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERARTIGER KATALYSATORSYSTEME, INSBESONDERE BEI ABSCHEIDUNG DES GOLDS AUF DEN TRÄGERMEDIEN MITTELS PVD | [2006/23] | English: | NANOSCALE GOLD CATALYSTS, ACTIVATING AGENTS, SUPPORT MEDIA, AND RELATED METHODOLOGIES USEFUL FOR MAKING SUCH CATALYST SYSTEMS ESPECIALLY WHEN THE GOLD IS DEPOSITED ONTO THE SUPPORT MEDIA USING PHYSICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION | [2006/23] | French: | CATALYSEURS, AGENTS D'ACTIVATION, SUPPORT ET METHODOLOGIES ASSOCIEES UTILISEES POUR PRODUIRE DES SYSTEMES CATALYTIQUES NOTAMMENT LORSQUE LE CATALYSEUR EST DEPOSE SUR LE SUPPORT PAR DEPOT PHYSIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 04.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08154982.6 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 24.05.2008 | EP08155693.8 / EP1977816 | EP10179499.8 / EP2316567 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | BE | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | IE | 23.09.2009 | LU | 23.09.2009 | SI | 23.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
LU | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
LU | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DY]US4046712 (CAIRNS JAMES ANTHONY, et al); | [XAY]GB1486108 (ICI LTD); | [XAY]US4469640 (CARCIA PETER F [US], et al); | [X]US5559065 (LAUTH GUENTER [DE], et al); | [XAY]WO9743042 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [XY]WO9800413 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al); | [XY]EP0827779 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al); | [XY]EP1040869 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]); | [XY]WO0059632 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al); | [DY]DE10030637 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]US2003004054 (ITO MIHO [JP], et al); | [XA]US2003013904 (CHATURVEDI SANJAY [US], et al); | [XY]US2003073573 (BAKER R TERRY K [US], et al); | [XY]US2003134741 (WEISBECK MARKUS [DE], et al); | [E]WO2004112958 (CARRIER CORP [US]); |