EP1694731 - PHOTOCURABLE PERFLUOROPOLYETHERS FOR USE AS NOVEL MATERIALS IN MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 308 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4105 Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4105 / US | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1200 East California Boulevard Mail Code 210-85 Pasadena, CA 91125 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 308 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4105 Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4105 / US | ||
For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1200 East California Boulevard, Mail Code 210-85 Pasadena, CA 91125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESIMONE, Joseph M. 7315 Crescent Ridge Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 02 /
ROLLAND, Jason P. 102 Hollow Oak Drive Durham, NC 27713 / US | 03 /
QUAKE, Stephen R. 636 Alvarado Row Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 04 /
SCHORZMAN, Derek A. Campus Box 3290 Venable Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599 / US | 05 /
YARBROUGH, Jason 410 Melbourne Lane Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US | 06 /
VAN DAM, Michael 1630 Calle Vaquero Suite 408 Glendale CA, 91206 / US | [2012/13] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
DESIMONE, Joseph M. 7315 Crescent Ridge Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | ||
02 /
ROLLAND, Jason P. 102 Hollow Oak Drive Durham, NC 27713 / US | |||
03 /
QUAKE, Stephen R. 636 Alvarado Row Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
04 /
SCHORZMAN, Derek A. Campus Box 3290, Venable Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599 / US | |||
05 /
YARBROUGH, Jason 410 Melbourne Lane Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US | |||
06 /
VAN DAM, Michael 1630 Calle Vaquero Suite 408 Glendale CA, 91206 / US | |||
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
DESIMONE, Joseph M. 7315 Crescent Ridge Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | ||
02 /
ROLLAND, Jason P. 102 Hollow Oak Drive Durham, NC 27713 / US | |||
03 /
QUAKE, Stephen R. 120 W. 15th St., 6F New York, NY 10011 / US | |||
04 /
SCHORZMAN, Derek A. Campus Box 3290, Venable Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599 / US | |||
05 /
YARBROUGH, Jason 103 Dickens Court, No. 6 Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | |||
06 /
VAN DAM, Michael 1630 Calle Vaquero 408 Glendale CA, 91206 / US | |||
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
DESIMONE, Joseph M. 7315 Crescent Ridge Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | ||
02 /
ROLLAND, Jason P. 102 Hollow Oak Drive Durham, NC 27713 / US | |||
03 /
QUAKE, Stephen R. 120 W. 15th St., 6F New York, NY 10011 / US | |||
04 /
SCHORZMAN, Derek A. Campus Box 3290, Venable Hall Chapel Hill, NC 27599 / US | |||
05 /
YARBROUGH, Jason 103 Dickens Court, No. 6 Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | |||
06 /
VAN DAM, Michael 330 Cordova nr. 327 Pasadena, CA 91101 / US | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Behnisch, Werner Isarpatent Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR, Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04784924.5 | 23.09.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004US31274 | Priority number, date | US20030505384P | 23.09.2003 Original published format: US 505384 P | US20030524788P | 21.11.2003 Original published format: US 524788 P | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005030822 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1694731 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694731 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/20, H01M4/88, H01M8/10, B05D5/12, C08J5/12, C09D171/02 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B01L3/502738 (EP,US);
B81B1/006 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/5015 (EP,US);
C08G18/8116 (EP,US);
C08G65/007 (EP,US);
C08G65/33348 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
C09D171/02 (EP,US);
F16K99/0001 (EP,US);
F16K99/0015 (EP,US);
F16K99/0026 (EP,US);
F16K99/0036 (EP,US);
F16K99/0042 (EP,US);
F16K99/0046 (EP,US);
F16K99/0051 (EP,US);
F16K99/0059 (EP,US);
F16K99/0061 (EP,US);
F16K99/0065 (EP,US);
G03F7/0002 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0481 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0655 (EP,US);
B01L3/0268 (EP,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
B81B2201/058 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0323 (EP,US);
B81C2201/034 (EP,US);
C08G2650/48 (EP,US);
F16K2099/008 (EP,US);
F16K2099/0084 (EP,US);
F16K2099/0086 (EP,US);
F16K99/0034 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0396 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249954 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/22] | C08J5/20, H01M4/88, H01M8/10, B05D5/12 | ||
Former IPC [2006/35] | C08G/ | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | 21.04.2006 | HR | 21.04.2006 | LT | 21.04.2006 | LV | 21.04.2006 | MK | 21.04.2006 | Title | German: | PHOTOHÄRTBARE PERFLUORPOLYETHER ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS NEUE WERKSTOFFE IN MIKROFLUIDISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2006/35] | English: | PHOTOCURABLE PERFLUOROPOLYETHERS FOR USE AS NOVEL MATERIALS IN MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES | [2006/35] | French: | PERFLUOROPOLYETHERS PHOTOPOLYMERISABLES DESTINES A ETRE UTILISES COMME NOUVEAUX MATERIAUX DANS DES DISPOSITIFS MICROFLUIDIQUES | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2006 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2004 | AT | 28.03.2012 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | PT | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | LU | 23.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 23.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 29.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002160139 (HUANG JIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-25,27-35* example -; claims 1,29 *; | [AP] - WOOD C D ET AL, "New fluoropolymer materials", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.JFLUCHEM.2004.09.029, (20041111), vol. 125, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1139, pages 1671 - 1676, XP004669202 [AP] 1-25,27-35 * figure 3 * * Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfluchem.2004.09.029 | [A] - PRIOLA A ET AL, "UV-CURABLE SYSTEMS CONTAIING PERFLUOROPOLYETHER STRUCTURES: SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERISATION", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1002/MACP.1997.021980618, (19970601), vol. 198, no. 6, ISSN 1022-1352, pages 1893 - 1907, XP000696483 [A] 1-25,27-35 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1997.021980618 | International search | [A]US4567073 (LARSON JAMES M [US], et al); | [A]US6403539 (MARCHIONNI GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) | by applicant | US6091433 | US6128022 | US6150180 | US6274089 | US6334676 | US6408878 | US6444461 | US6495369 | US6508988 | US6529835 | US6547941 | US6558944 | US6620625 | US6630353 | US6729352 | US6737026 | US6749814 | US6752922 | US6767706 | - BUNYARD, W. ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (1999), vol. 32, pages 8224 - 8226 | - JONES, W. R., JR., "The Properties of Perfluoropolyethers Used for Space Applications", NASA TECHNICAL MEMORANDUM, (199307), vol. 106, page 275 |