EP1627360 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPRESENTING IMAGE GRANULARITY BY ONE OR MORE PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | [2018/24] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-13 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMILA, Cristina 25C Chestnut Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
KOBILANSKY, Alexander 17 Seneca Road Ossining, NY 10562 / US | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2006/08] | Rossmanith, Manfred Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 04785461.7 | 30.03.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004US09491 | Priority number, date | US20030470712P | 15.05.2003 Original published format: US 470712 P | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004104931 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627360 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627360 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T5/10, H04N19/61, H04N19/85, G06T9/00, H04N5/262 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
G06T5/70 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/157 (KR);
G06T5/10 (EP,BR,US);
G06T9/00 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/60 (BR);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/262 (EP,BR,US);
H04N5/87 (KR);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20056 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20204 (EP,BR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/08] | G06T9/00, H04N5/262 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/40] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REPRÄSENTIEREN DER BILDGRANULARITÄT DURCH EINEN ODER MEHRERE PARAMETER | [2006/08] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPRESENTING IMAGE GRANULARITY BY ONE OR MORE PARAMETERS | [2006/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE REPRESENTER LA GRANULARITE D'UNE IMAGE PAR UN OU PLUSIEURS PARAMETRES | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18198246.3 / EP3457359 | EP20154535.7 / EP3678097 | EP20203073.0 / EP3798988 | EP21160153.9 / EP3862973 | EP21180366.3 / EP3913579 | EP22174600.1 / EP4083923 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IE | 30.03.2019 | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/09] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5641596 (GRAY ROBERT T [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, line 23 - line 40 * * column 2, line 57 - line 66 * * column 3, line 24 - line 64 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 16 * * column 6, line 19 - line 61 * [A] 2-14,16-26; | [A]US6269180 (SEVIGNY BENOIT [CA]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [XA]WO0233958 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * page 19, line 28 - page 23, line 11 * * page 25, line 5 - page 27, line 29 * * page 35, line 10 - page 36, line 6 * [A] 2-14,16-26; | [A] - PEISONG CHEN ET AL, "Video coding for digital cinema", PROCEEDINGS 2002 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 2002. ROCHESTER, NY, SEPT. 22 - 25, 2002, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020922), VOL. 2 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-7622-6, pages 749 - 752, XP010607432 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2002.1038133 | [A] - OKLEM R ET AL, "A wavelet transform method for coding film-grain noise corrupted images", PROCEEDINGS 2000 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ISTANBUL, TURKEY, 5-9 JUNE 2000, (20000605), vol. 6, pages 2063 - 2066, XP010504703 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | [A] - CAMPISI P ET AL, "Signal-dependent film grain noise generation using homomorphic adaptive filtering", IEE PROCEEDINGS: VISION, IMAGE AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, GB, (20000623), vol. 147, no. 3, ISSN 1350-245X, pages 283 - 287, XP006014574 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-vis:20000212 | [A] - JACKY CHUN KIT YAN ET AL, "Signal-dependent film grain noise removal and generation based on higher-order statistics", HIGHER-ORDER STATISTICS, 1997., PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING WORKSHOP ON BANFF, ALTA., CANADA 21-23 JULY 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970721), ISBN 0-8186-8005-9, pages 77 - 81, XP010239820 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | [A] - YAN J C K ET AL, "Film grain noise removal and generation for color images", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 12-15 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980512), ISBN 0-7803-4428-6, pages 2957 - 2960, XP010279377 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.678146 | [A] - SHAHNAZ R ET AL, "Image compression in signal-dependent noise", APPL. OPT. (USA), APPLIED OPTICS, 10 SEPT. 1999, OPT. SOC. AMERICA, USA, (19990910), vol. 38, no. 26, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 5560 - 5567, XP002291572 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.38.005560 | Examination | WO0177871 |