EP1658483 - DIAGNOSTIC TEST FOR ANALYTES IN A SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANTAGE DIAGNOSTICS CORPORATION 764 San Aleso Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARLTON, David 1206 Sesame Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04785762.8 | 19.03.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004US08355 | Priority number, date | US20030456771 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: US 456771 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005003732 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1658483 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658483 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558, G01N33/76 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N2333/16 (EP,US);
G01N2333/18 (EP,US);
G01N2333/59 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | G01N33/53 | ||
Former IPC [2006/21] | G01N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Extension states | AL | 05.01.2006 | LT | 05.01.2006 | LV | 05.01.2006 | MK | 05.01.2006 | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHER TEST FÜR ANALYTEN IN EINER PROBE | [2006/21] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC TEST FOR ANALYTES IN A SAMPLE | [2006/21] | French: | ESSAI DIAGNOSTIQUE POUR ANALYTES DANS UN ECHANTILLON | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 14.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 19.12.2007 | ID: | 02 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 19.12.2007 | [2008/09] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IT | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | IE | 19.03.2011 | LU | 19.03.2011 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.03.2011 | ||
LU | 19.03.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.03.2011 | ||
LU | 19.03.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.03.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0262328 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [X]EP0291176 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [X]EP0306336 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [X]EP0512390 (FUJIREBIO KK [JP]); | [X]WO0007015 (SYNTRON BIORESEARCH INC [US], et al); | [X]US6027943 (KANG JEMO [US], et al); | [X]WO0020866 (GENOSIS LTD [GB], et al) | International search | [X]US5656503 (MAY KEITH [GB], et al); | [X]US2001023076 (GUAN MING [SG], et al) | Examination | WO0136974 | US2002168782 |