EP1648513 - USE OF ADCC-OPTIMIZED ANTIBODIES FOR TREATING PATIENTS ANSWERING WEAKLY TO ANTIBODY TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/17] | USE OF ADCC-OPTIMIZED ANTIBODIES FOR TREATING WEAK PATIENTS | ||
[2014/29] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.10.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratoire Français du Fractionnement et des Biotechnologies Zone d'Activité de Courtaboeuf 3, avenue des Tropiques 91940 Les Ulis / FR | [2013/34] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states LFB Biotechnologies 3 Avenue des Tropiques ZA de Courtaboeuf 91940 Les Ulis / FR | ||
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Laboratoire Français du Fractionnement et des Biotechnologies Zone d'Activité de Courtaboeuf, 3, avenue des Tropiques 91940 Les Ulis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUREL, Dominique 35, avenue Germaine F-59110 La Madeleine / FR | 02 /
JORIEUX, Sylvie 17, rue Molière F-59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | 03 /
DE ROMEUF, Christophe 116, rue de la Bassée F-59000 Lille / FR | 04 /
KLEIN, Philippe 6, Rue Corbet 59000- Lille / FR | 05 /
GAUCHET, Christine 32, Rue des Mésanges 59320- Sédequin / FR | 06 /
BIHOREAU, Nicolas 36, avenue Parrat F-91400 Orsay / FR | 07 /
GAUCHET, Christine 32, Rue des Mésanges 59320 Sequedin / FR | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/30] | Faivre Petit, Frédérique, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2006/17] | Warcoin, Jacques Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04786018.4 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004FR02057 | Priority number, date | FR20030009440 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: FR 0309440 | [2006/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005012358 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1648513 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1648513 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P37/02, A61P35/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
C07K16/34 (EP,US);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P33/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K16/2833 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ADCC-OPTIMIERTEN ANTIKÖRPERN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PATIENTEN, DIE NUR SCHWACH AUF ANTIKÖRPER ANSPRECHEN | [2017/29] | English: | USE OF ADCC-OPTIMIZED ANTIBODIES FOR TREATING PATIENTS ANSWERING WEAKLY TO ANTIBODY TREATMENT | [2017/29] | French: | UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS AYANT UNE ADCC OPTIMISÉE POUR TRAITER LES PATIENTS RÉPONDANT FAIBLEMENT AU TRAITEMENT PAR ANTICORPS | [2017/29] |
Former [2006/17] | VERWENDUNG VON ADCC-OPTIMIERTEN ANTIKÖRPERN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHWACHEN PATIENTEN | ||
Former [2006/17] | USE OF ADCC-OPTIMIZED ANTIBODIES FOR TREATING WEAK PATIENTS | ||
Former [2006/17] | UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS ANTI-RHESUS DE PRODUITS DANS LA LIGNEE YB2/0 | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10181317.8 / EP2275134 | EP16203349.2 / EP3159008 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2015
10.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Strasse 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Hemsath, Lars, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
24.06.2015
10.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger, et al, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2015
10.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Strasse 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Hemsath, Lars, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
24.06.2015
10.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger, et al, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2015/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2015
10.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Strasse 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Hemsath, Lars, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
24.06.2015
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2015/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2015
König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Strasse 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Hemsath, Lars, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Lohengrinstraße 11 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
24.06.2015
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | 31.07.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.07.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/45] | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 14.09.2017 | Appeal received No. T2043/17 | 14.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.07.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2004 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | PT | 26.01.2015 | IE | 30.07.2015 | LU | 30.07.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/33] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 30.07.2015 | ||
LU | 30.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0576093 (AETSRN [FR], et al) [A] 1-9,13-15 * page 3, line 11 - line 37 *; | [X]WO0177181 (LAB FRANCAIS DU FRACTIONNEMENT [FR], et al) [X] 1-9,13-15 * page 35, line 23 - page 37, line 14; claims 1-32 *; | [DX] - KUMPEL B M ET AL, "Clearance of red cells by monoclonal IgG3 anti-D in vivo is affected by the VF polymorphism of FcgammaRIIIa (CD16).", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (200304), vol. 132, no. 1, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 81 - 86, XP001193742 [DX] 1-9,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2249.2003.02119.x | [DA] - SHINKAWA T ET AL, "The absence of fucose but not the presence of galactose or bisecting N-acetylglucosamine of human IgG1 complex-type oligosaccharides shows the critical role of enhancing antibody-dependent cellular cytotoxicity", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20030131), vol. 278, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3466 - 3473, XP002965857 [DA] 1-9,13-15 * page 3466, column L * * page 3471, column L, paragraph LAST - page 3473, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210665200 | [DA] - UMANA P ET AL, "ENGINEERED GLYCOFORMS OF AN ANTINEUROBLASTOMA IGG1 WITH OPTIMIZED ANTIBODY-DEPENDENT CELLULAR CYTOTOXIC ACTIVITY", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (199902), vol. 17, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 176 - 180, XP002921620 [DA] 1-9,13-15 * page 176, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/6179 | [DA] - SHIELDS R L ET AL, "Lack of fucose on human IgG1 N-linked oligosaccharide improves binding to human FcgammaRIII and antibody-dependent cellular toxicity", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20020726), vol. 277, no. 30, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 26733 - 26740, XP002964542 [DA] 1-9,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M202069200 | [DX] - CARTRON GUILLAUME ET AL, "Therapeutic activity of humanized anti-CD20 monoclonal antibody and polymorphism in IgG Fc receptor FcgammaRIIIa gene", BLOOD, & 43RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, PART 1; ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA; DECEMBER 07-11, 2001, (20011116), vol. 98, no. 11 Part 1, ISSN 0006-4971, page 602a, XP001193741 [DX] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V99.3.754 | [X] - CROWE J S ET AL, "HUMANIZED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY CAMPATH-1H MYELOMA CELL EXPRESSION OF GENOMIC CONSTRUCTS NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF CDNA CONSTRUCTS AND COMPARISON OF EFFECTOR MECHANISMS OF MYELOMA AND CHINESE HAMSTER OVARY CELL-DERIVED MATERIAL", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, (1992), vol. 87, no. 1, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 105 - 110, XP008034008 [X] 1,6-10,12-15 * page 106, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 107, column R, line 10 - line 56 * | [X] - LIFELY M R (REPRINT) ET AL, "Glycosylation and biological-activity of CAMPATH-1H expressed in different cell-lines and grown under different culture conditions", GLYCOBIOLOGY, IRL PRESS,, GB, (199512), vol. 5, no. 8, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 813 - 822, XP002096118 [X] 1,6-10,12-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/5.8.813 | Examination | EP1176195 | - N. I. OLOVNIKOVA ET AL, "Effect of Producer Cell Line on Functional Activity of Anti-D Monoclonal Antibodies Destined for Prevention of Rhesus Sensitization", BULLETIN OF EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, (20090401), vol. 147, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s10517-009-0516-0, ISSN 0007-4888, pages 448 - 452, XP055000368 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10517-009-0516-0 | - SHIELDS R L ET AL, "Lack of fucose on human IgG1 N-linked oligosaccharide improves binding to human FcgammaRIII and antibody-dependent cellular toxicity", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20020726), vol. 277, no. 30, doi:10.1074/JBC.M202069200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 26733 - 26740, XP002964542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M202069200 | - GUILE G ET AL, "Rapid High-Resolution High-Performance Liquid Chromatographic Method for Separating Glycan Mixtures and Analyzing Oligosaccharide Profiles", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 240, pages 210 - 226 | - DWEK R.A ET AL, "Glycobiology: "The function of sugar in the IgG molecule"", J. ANAT., (1995), vol. 187, pages 279 - 292 | - HOLLAND M. ET AL, "Hypogalactosylation of serum IgG in patients with ANCA-associated systemic vasculitis", CLIN EXP IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 129, pages 183 - 190 | - CHANG K. H. ET AL., "Quantitative analysis of oligosaccharide structure of glycoproteins", BIOTECHNOL. BIOPROCESS ENG., (2000), vol. 5, pages 136 - 140 | - CHARLWOOD J. ET AL, "Characterization of the lycosylation profiles of alzheimer's beta-secretase protein Asp-2 expressed in a variety of cell lines", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 276, no. 20, pages 16739 - 16748 | by applicant | - CARTRON G; DACHEUX L; SALLES G; SOLAL-CELIGNY P; BARDOS P; COLOMBAT P; WATIER H, "Therapeutic activity of humanized anti-CD20 monoclonal antibody and polymorphism in IgG Fc receptor FcgammaRIIIa gene", BLOOD, (20020201), vol. 99, no. 3, pages 754 - 8 |