EP1660250 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING METALLIC FLAT WIRES OR STRIPS WITH A CUBIC TEXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leibniz-Institut für Festkörper- und Werkstoffforschung Dresden e.V. Helmholtzstrasse 20 01069 Dresden / DE | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICKEMEYER, Jörg Hermann-Seidel-Str. 15 01279 Dresden / DE | 02 /
SELBMANN, Dietmar Untere Hauptstr. 32 01738 Colmnitz / DE | 03 /
OPITZ, Ralph Gomlitzer Höhe 11 01108 Dresden / DE | 04 /
HOLZAPFEL, Bernhard Kirchweg 23 A 01731 Kreischa / DE | 05 /
WENDROCK, Horst Grossenhainer Str. 2a 01561 Kleinthiemig / DE | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Bienertstrasse 15 01187 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte, Bienerstrasse 15 01187 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04786229.7 | 20.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004EP51853 | Priority number, date | DE2003139867 | 25.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339867 | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023445 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660250 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1660250 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21C1/00, C22F1/08, C22F1/10, C22F1/14 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B21C1/003 (EP,US);
B21C1/00 (KR);
C22F1/08 (EP,US);
C22F1/10 (EP,US);
C22F1/14 (EP,US);
H10N60/0576 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5187 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLISCHEN FLACHDRÄHTEN ODER BÄNDERN MIT WÜRFELTEXTUR | [2006/22] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING METALLIC FLAT WIRES OR STRIPS WITH A CUBIC TEXTURE | [2006/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE FILS PLATS OU DE BANDES METALLIQUES PRESENTANT UNE TEXTURE CUBIQUE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 23.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | IE | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | PL | 01.08.2007 | RO | 01.08.2007 | SI | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | LU | 20.08.2007 | IT | 31.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | HU | 02.02.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
TR | 01.08.2007 | ||
LU | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
LU | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 12.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3634242 (HERAEUS GMBH W C) [A] 1,3* column 4, line 5 - line 22 *; | [A]WO0058044 (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 10 * * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 18 *; | [A]WO0060132 (DRESDEN EV INST FESTKOERPER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03024637 (LEIBNIZ INST FUER FESTKOERPER [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,6 * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 16 * |