EP1697482 - OIL-BASED DRILLING FLUID COMPRISING A NON-POLLUTING EMULSIFYING SYSTEM WHICH CAN BE USED FOR ANY BASE OIL AND WHICH IS STABLE IN RESPECT OF GAS HYDRATES FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | For all designated states Oleon N.V. Assenedestraat 2 9940 Ertvelde / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison Cédex / FR | ||
For all designated states Oleon N.V. Assenedestraat 2 9940 Ertvelde / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALMAZZONE, Christine 2, rue St Symphorien F-78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
AUDIBERT-HAYET, Annie 10, place Blanche de Castille F-78290 Croissy sur Seine / FR | 03 /
DEWATTINES, Carine Meusegemstraat 73 B-1861 Wolvertem / BE | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Guillat-Terpend, Michèle IFP Energies nouvelles 1 et 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Guillat-Terpend, Michèle Institut francais du pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04786251.1 | 02.08.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004FR02076 | Priority number, date | FR20030010268 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: FR 0310268 | [2006/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005023959 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697482 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697482 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/32 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
C09K8/36 (EP);
C09K8/32 (EP);
C09K2208/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖLBASIERTE BOHRFLÜSSIGKEIT MIT EINEM UMWELTMÄSSIG UNBEDENKLICHEN, FÜR ALLE BASISÖLE EINSETZBAREN UND GEGENÜBER GASHYDRATBILDUNG STABILEN EMULGIERSYSTEM | [2006/51] | English: | OIL-BASED DRILLING FLUID COMPRISING A NON-POLLUTING EMULSIFYING SYSTEM WHICH CAN BE USED FOR ANY BASE OIL AND WHICH IS STABLE IN RESPECT OF GAS HYDRATES FORMATION | [2006/36] | French: | FLUIDE DE PUITS À BASE D' HUILE COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME ÉMULSIFIANT NON-POLLUANT, UTILISABLE POUR TOUT TYPE D' HUILE DE BASE ET STABLE VIS-À -VIS DE LA FORMATION DES HYDRATES DE GAZ | [2006/36] |
Former [2006/36] | ÖLBASIERTE BOHRFLÜSSIGKEIT MIT EINEM UMWELTMÄSSIG UNBEDENKLICHEN, FÜR ALLE BASISÖLE EINSETZBAREN UND GEGENÜBER GLASHYDRATÖLUNG STABILEN EMULGIERSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.2007 | CY | 04.07.2007 | CZ | 04.07.2007 | DK | 04.07.2007 | EE | 04.07.2007 | FI | 04.07.2007 | IE | 04.07.2007 | PL | 04.07.2007 | RO | 04.07.2007 | SI | 04.07.2007 | SK | 04.07.2007 | TR | 04.07.2007 | LU | 02.08.2007 | BE | 31.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | BG | 04.10.2007 | SE | 04.10.2007 | GR | 05.10.2007 | ES | 15.10.2007 | PT | 04.12.2007 | HU | 05.01.2008 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
LU | 02.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
HU | 05.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | SI | 04.07.2007 | |
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | SI | 04.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2793188 (SWAIN CHARLES B, et al) [A] 1-3,6-13 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4 *; | [A]US4108779 (CARNEY LEROY L) [A] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 8 - line 60 *; | [A]WO0194495 (INST FRACAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-13* tout le document *; | [A]US2003114316 (PATEL ARVIND D [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-13 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * |