EP1658663 - HIGH ENERGY OPTICAL FIBER AMPLIFIER FOR PICOSECOND-NANOSECOND PULSES FOR ADVANCED MATERIAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imra America, Inc. 1044 Woodridge Avenue Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERMANN, Martin, E. 4786 Oak Hollow Dexter, MI 48130 / US | 02 /
HARTL, Ingmar 1109 Woodlawn Ave. Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | 03 /
IMESHEV, Gennady 28 Misty Meadow Irvine, CA 92612 / US | 04 /
PATEL, Rajesh, S. 3866 Cardinal Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | [2013/32] |
Former [2006/21] | 01 /
FERMANN, Martin, E. 4786 Oak Hollow Dexter, MI 48130 / US | ||
02 /
HARTL, Ingmar 1109 Woodlawn Ave. Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | |||
03 /
IMESHEV, Gennady 1527 Natalie Lane, Apt. 308 Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | |||
04 /
PATEL, Rajesh, S. 3866 Cardinal Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | Representative(s) | Hartig, Michael, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Hartig, Michael, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstraße 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04786591.0 | 27.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004US27808 | Priority number, date | US20030498056P | 27.08.2003 Original published format: US 498056 P | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005022705 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1658663 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/35, G02F1/37, H01S3/00, H01S3/10, H01S3/067 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
G02F1/39 (EP,US);
B23K26/0622 (EP,US);
B23K26/0624 (EP,US);
G02F1/3548 (EP,US);
G02F1/392 (EP,US);
H01S2301/03 (EP,US);
H01S3/0057 (EP,US);
H01S3/0604 (EP,US);
H01S3/06704 (EP,US);
H01S3/06725 (EP,US);
H01S3/06741 (EP,US);
H01S3/06758 (EP,US);
H01S3/08045 (EP,US);
H01S3/094007 (EP,US);
H01S3/115 (EP,US);
H01S3/2325 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | G02F1/35, G02F1/37, H01S3/00, H01S3/10 | ||
Former IPC [2006/21] | H01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHER HOCHENERGIEVERSTÄRKER FÜR PIKOSEKUNDEN-NANOSEKUNDEN-IMPULSE FÜR FORTSCHRITTLICHE MATERIALBEARBEITUNGSANWENDUNGEN | [2006/21] | English: | HIGH ENERGY OPTICAL FIBER AMPLIFIER FOR PICOSECOND-NANOSECOND PULSES FOR ADVANCED MATERIAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS | [2006/21] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR A FIBRE OPTIQUE HAUTE ENERGIE POUR IMPULSIONS PICOSECONDE-NANOSECONDE DESTINEES A DES APPLICATIONS DE TRAITEMENT DE MATERIAUX HAUTES PERFORMANCES | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/32] | Divisional application(s) | EP13158802.2 / EP2648039 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5909306 (GOLDBERG LEW [US], et al) [A] 1,6-21 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 35; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6151338 (GRUBB STEPHEN G [US], et al) [Y] 1,6-21 * column 3, line 48 - line 55 * * column 7, line 34 - line 37 * * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 8; figure 4 *; | [DA]US6181463 (GALVANAUSKAS ALMANTAS [US], et al) [DA] 1,6-21* column 7, line 25 - line 37 *; | [Y]US2002172481 (KUBOTA SHIGEO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6-21 * paragraph [0072] *; | [Y]US2003065312 (OWA SOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6-21 * paragraphs [0035] , [0039] , [0045] , [0046]; figures 2,3 * | International search | [A]US4761786 (BAER THOMAS M [US]); | [A]US4847850 (KAFKA JAMES D [US], et al); | [A]US5880877 (FERMANN MARTIN E [US], et al); | [A]US6014249 (FERMANN MARTIN E [US], et al); | [Y]US6181463 (GALVANAUSKAS ALMANTAS [US], et al); | [A]US6208458 (GALVANAUSKAS ALMANTAS [US], et al); | [Y]US6301271 (SANDERS STEVEN [US], et al); | [A]US6304585 (SANDERS STEVEN [US], et al); | [Y]US2003065312 (OWA SOICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US6590698 (OHTSUKI TOMOKO [US], et al); | [A]US2003202547 (FERMANN MARTIN E [US], et al) | Examination | US5847863 | by applicant | US6151338 | US2003065312 |