EP1665464 - REFLECTOR ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.D.C. Automotive Distance Control System GmbH Kemptener Str. 99 88131 Lindau / DE | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜHNKE, Lutz Saint-Dié-Strasse 25 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
WINTERMANTEL, Markus Hammerweg 38 88131 Lindau / DE | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
KÜHNKE, Lutz Töpferweg 57 89155 Erbach / DE | ||
02 /
WINTERMANTEL, Markus Hammerweg 38 88131 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 04786695.9 | 01.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004DE01925 | Priority number, date | DE2003144535 | 25.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10344535 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031921 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1665464 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/14, H01Q1/32, H01Q3/46 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H01Q1/32 (EP);
H01Q15/14 (EP);
H01Q19/185 (EP);
H01Q3/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLEKTORANTENNE | [2006/23] | English: | REFLECTOR ANTENNA | [2006/23] | French: | ANTENNE A REFLECTEUR | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]DE19848722 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG) [XD] 1-4,7,10 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 58 * * column 4, lines 59-67 *; | [X]US3514781 (ZIMMERMAN WILEY E ET AL) [X] 1-4,7 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 40; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH08102616 ; | [X]EP0891003 (HUGHES ELECTRONICS CORP) [X] 1,2,4,7 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 45 * * figures 2-6 *; | [A]GB1488590 (THOMSON CSF) [A] 1-10 * page 2, lines 75-120 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2003058189 (CROUCH DAVID D ET AL) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0032] - [0035] * * figures 1-3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08102616 A 19960416 (YUSEISHO TSUSHIN SOGO KENKYUSHO; NEC CORP) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * |