EP1676412 - Method for establishing a direct coordination link between a first and second control centre for carrying out services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/27] | METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A DIRECT COORDINATION LINK BETWEEN A FIRST AND SECOND CONTROL CENTRE FOR CARRYING OUT SERVICES | ||
[2006/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATRAS, Bruno 37, rue Claude Decaen F-75012 PARIS / FR | 02 /
CLEUZIOU, Olivier 18, rue Monmousseau - Bâtiment C F-94200 IVRY SUR SEINE / FR | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04787484.7 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004FR02469 | Priority number, date | FR20030012193 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: FR 0312193 | [2006/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005048557 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1676412 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1676412 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04Q3/00 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0016 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/27] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Direktkoordinationsverbindung zwischen einer ersten und einer zweiten Steuerzentrale zur Ausführung von Diensten | [2006/41] | English: | Method for establishing a direct coordination link between a first and second control centre for carrying out services | [2006/41] | French: | Procédé pour etablir un liaison directe de coordination entre un premier et un secnd centres de commande d'execution de services | [2006/41] |
Former [2006/27] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DIREKTKOORDINATIONSVERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN EINER ERSTEN UND EINER ZWEITEN STEUERZENTRALE ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON DIENSTEN | ||
Former [2006/27] | METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A DIRECT COORDINATION LINK BETWEEN A FIRST AND SECOND CONTROL CENTRE FOR CARRYING OUT SERVICES | ||
Former [2006/27] | PROCEDE POUR ETABLIR UNE LIAISON DIRECTE DE COORDINATION ENTRE UN PREMIER ET UN SECOND CENTRES DE COMMANDE D EXECUTION DE SER VICES. | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 26.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | CZ | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | EE | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | IE | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | PL | 21.02.2007 | RO | 21.02.2007 | SI | 21.02.2007 | SK | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | BG | 21.05.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | HU | 22.08.2007 | LU | 29.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/44] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
TR | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
HU | 22.08.2007 | ||
LU | 29.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
HU | 22.08.2007 | ||
LU | 29.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/31] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 21.02.2007 | |
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6463141 (TUUNANEN HEIKKI [FI], et al) [A] 1,9,17,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002154756 (JELLEMA BART [NL], et al) [A] 1,9,17,20* the whole document *; | [A]US6560327 (MCCONNELL VON K [US]) [A] 1,9,17,20 * column 8, line 16 - line 40 * * column 9, line 55 - line 59 * * column 10, line 30 - line 31 * |