EP1670797 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF RISPERIDONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jubilant Organosys Limited 1A, Sector 16A, Institutional Area Noida 210 301 Uttar Pradesh / IN | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRINIVASA RAO, Guntu House No. 186, 6th Cross, Navilu Road Kuvempu Nagar, Mysore 570 023 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
PRASANNA KUMAR, Basavapatna, N. D. No. 315, 16th Cross, Aravinda Nagar Mysore 570 023 Karnataka / IN | 03 /
MANJUNATHA, Sulur, G. D. No. 491 A-B Chitrabanu Road, Kuvempu Nagar Mysore 570 023 Karnataka / IN | 04 /
KULKARNI, Ashok, Krishna D. No. 1447, C & D Block Sanje Ravi Road Kuvempu Nagar, Mysore 570 023 Karnataka / IN | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04787585.1 | 24.09.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004IN00303 | Priority number, date | IN2003DE01209 | 26.09.2003 Original published format: IN DE12092003 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005030772 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1670797 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON RISPERIDON | [2006/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF RISPERIDONE | [2006/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE RISPERIDONE | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 21.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0212200 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [DA] 1-23 * claim 1 *; | [DA]WO0185731 (RPG LIFE SCIENCES LTD [IN], et al) [DA] 1-23 * claim 1 *; | [XP]WO2004009591 (AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD [IN], et al) [XP] 1-23 * claim 1 * |