EP1681114 - FILLER FOR LADLE SLIDING AND OPENING/CLOSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamakawa Sangyo Co., Ltd. 1-3-27, Nishinagasucho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0805 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON ROTARY NOZZLE CO., LTD. 3, Bentencho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0044 / JP | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHASHI, Akira YAMAKAWA SANGYO CO., LTD., 1-3-27, Nishinagasucho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0805 / JP | 02 /
KAWAKAMI, Manabu YAMAKAWA SANGYO CO., LTD., 1-3-27, Nishinagasucho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0805 / JP | 03 /
TAKASUGI, Hideto, NIPPON ROTARY NOZZLE CO., LTD 3, Bentencho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0044 / JP | 04 /
ISHII, Takeshi, c/o JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 05 /
KOHIRA, Satoshi, c/o JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 06 /
TAIRA, Masao, c/o JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 07 /
TANO, Manabu, c/o JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Bolinches, Michel Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Bolinches, Michel Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04787777.4 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004JP13113 | Priority number, date | JP20030321750 | 12.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003321750 | [2006/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005025777 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681114 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D41/46, C04B35/66 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
C04B35/62839 (EP,US);
B22D41/46 (EP,US);
C04B35/14 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3243 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3472 (EP,US);
C04B2235/424 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5296 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5427 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2006/51] |
Former [2006/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜLLER FÜR GIESSPFANNENSCHIEBE- UND -ÖFFNUNGS-/SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/29] | English: | FILLER FOR LADLE SLIDING AND OPENING/CLOSING DEVICE | [2006/29] | French: | CHARGE POUR DISPOSITIF DE DEPLACEMENT ET D'OUVERTURE/DE FERMETURE DE POCHE DE COULEE | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2006 | Translation filed | 31.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57139466 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | US4525463 [ ] (DISLICH HEINZ [DE], et al); | US4928931 [ ] (DISLICH HEINZ [DE], et al); | [X]US5124285 (DISLICH MARGRIT [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [DX]JPH0671424 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO) [DX] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]JPH07251261 (YAMAKAWA SANGYO KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0010]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0846512 (YAMAKAWA SANGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure 1; claims 1-4; tables 1,2,4,6 *; | [X]JPH11277220 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0950452 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-5; claims 1-14; tables 1-5 *; | [X]JPH11300468 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH07251261 (YAMAKAWA SANGYO KK); | [A]JPH0890214 (AICHI STEEL WORKS LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH11277220 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11300468 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2000317625 (YAMAKAWA SANGYO KK) |