13.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
01.05.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
23.05.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
16.05.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.05.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.12.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.11.2007 |
Change - English title |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
23.11.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.06.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.02.2007 |
First examination report |
|
14.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.11.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
17.11.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
17.11.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
17.11.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
17.11.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
19.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
12.05.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
11.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|