EP1669666 - BACKLIGHT DEVICE AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANAKA, Masato; c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo;1410001 / JP | 02 /
YOKOTA, Kazuhiro; c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo;1410001 / JP | 03 /
WADA, Haruaki; c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo;1410001 / JP | 04 /
OKU, Takashi; c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo;1410001 / JP | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04788076.0 | 24.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004JP13917 | Priority number, date | JP20030340810 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003340810 | [2006/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033579 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1669666 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
G02B6/0018 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02B6/0001 (KR);
G02B6/0055 (EP,US);
G02B6/0056 (EP,US);
G02B6/0068 (EP,US);
G02F1/133603 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | F21V8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/01] |
Former [2006/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE | [2006/24] | English: | BACKLIGHT DEVICE AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY | [2006/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF LUMINEUX ET AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2005 | Translation filed | 27.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 16.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 15.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6469755 (ADACHI MASAYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,5* figures 1-33 *; | [Y]WO02097324 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,5 * abstract *; | [Y]US2003095399 (GRENDA CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2003187623 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPH10321005 (CANON KK) | by applicant | DE202008017092U | US5992076 | US2006080881 | US6412207 | DE202006010962U | WO9628704 | US7568302 |