EP1677397 - SEMICONDUCTOR LASER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-0063 / JP | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYACHI, Mamoru c/o Sougoukenkyusyo Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 3502288 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Yoshinori c/o Sougoukenkyusyo Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 3502288 / JP | 03 /
CHIKUMA, Kiyofumi c/o Sougoukenkyusyo Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 3502288 / JP | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04788184.2 | 27.09.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004JP14088 | Priority number, date | JP20030364786 | 24.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003364786 | [2006/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005041373 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677397 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/40 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/2231 (EP,US);
H01S5/04256 (EP,US);
H01S5/4043 (EP,US);
H01S5/0201 (EP,US);
H01S5/0213 (EP,US);
H01S5/0217 (EP,US);
H01S5/04257 (EP,US);
H01S5/2004 (EP,US);
H01S5/2201 (EP,US);
H01S5/2214 (EP,US);
H01S5/34326 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/27] | H01S5/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/05] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERLASER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/27] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR LASER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2006/27] | French: | LASER SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT LASER | [2008/09] |
Former [2006/27] | LASER SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT LASER | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2006 | Translation filed | 24.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 30.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003002549 (OH MYEONG SEOK [KR]) [A] 1-5* figures 4,5 * | International search | [X]JPS54107689 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]US4901325 (KATO TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5355382 (KOVACS GREGORY J [US], et al); | [X]US5402436 (PAOLI THOMAS L [US]); | [Y]JPH10247648 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2000252593 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]JP2001119104 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]EP1126526 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2002053872 (YANG KUANG-NENG [TW], et al); | [A]US2002142503 (MIYACHI MAMORU [JP], et al) |