EP1681338 - MODIFIER FOR BIODIESEL FUEL, FUEL, METHODS RELATING TO THOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Care Fuels Corporation 1-6, Sengen 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0047 / JP | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Masatoshi 1250-2, Kouya, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 3002642 / JP | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04788296.4 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004JP14230 | Priority number, date | JP20030344051 | 02.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003344051 | [2006/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033252 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681338 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/02, C10L1/18, C07C45/40 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C10L1/1817 (EP,US);
C10L1/19 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/026 (EP,US);
C10L10/16 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US);
C10L1/1802 (EP,US);
C10L1/1811 (EP,US);
C10L1/191 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02P30/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/29] | C10L1/02, C10L1/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/02] |
Former [2006/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERUNGSMITTEL FÜR BIODIESELKRAFTSTOFF, KRAFTSTOFF, ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2006/29] | English: | MODIFIER FOR BIODIESEL FUEL, FUEL, METHODS RELATING TO THOSE | [2006/29] | French: | MODIFICATEUR POUR CARBURANT BIODIESEL, CARBURANT ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2006 | Translation filed | 12.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 21.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2010 | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/45] | 25.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB277326 (AVENARIUS GEB) [X] 1,3-6,10 * page 1, lines 28-38,60-63 *; | [X]GB321633 (JAMES MCKEE) [X] 1,3-6,10 * page 1, column 2, line 90 - line 102 * * page 1, column 1, line 45 - line 53 *; | [X]EP0235528 (HAENSLER J DR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,10 * example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP1026224 (MAERKL HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,10 * paragraphs [0042] - [0050]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6203585 (MAJERCZAK VICTORIA ANN [US]) | International search | [X] - KUNISAWA K. ET AL., "Ozone shoriabura no yusoyo nenryo to shiteno hyoka", THE SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, JAPAN DAI 35 KAI SHUKI TAIKAI KENKYU HAPPYO KOEN YOSHISHU, (2002), page 1062, XP002986421 | [Y] - DIAZ M. ET AL., "Spectroscopic characterization of ozonides with biological activity", OZONE SCI. ENG., (2001), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 35 - 40, XP002986422 |