EP1683835 - EPDM COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK CORPORATION 12-15, Shibadaimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIE, Satoshi, c/o NOK Corporation 2089, Nagakusatsutsumi, Aso-Machi Aso-Gun, Kumamoto 8692231 / JP | 02 /
KUDO, Masashi, c/o NOK Corporation 3-1, Tsujidoshinmachi 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2510042 / JP | 03 /
FUJIMOTO, Kenichi, c/o NOK Corporation 3-1, Tsujidoshinmachi 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2510042 / JP | [2013/10] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
HORIE, Satoshi, c/o NOK Corporation 2089, Nagakusatsutsumi, Aso-Machi Aso-Gun, Kumamoto 8692231 / JP | ||
02 /
KUDO, Masashi, c/o NOK Corporation 3-1, Tsujidoshinmachi 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2510042 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJIMOTO, Kenichi, c/o NOK Corporation 3-1, Tsujidoshinmachi 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2510042 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04788313.7 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004JP14247 | Priority number, date | JP20030380695 | 11.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003380695 | [2006/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005044912 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683835 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683835 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08K3/22, C08K5/14, C09K3/10, F16J15/10 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
F16J15/102 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0642 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/16, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/07] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EPDM-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/30] | English: | EPDM COMPOSITION | [2006/30] | French: | COMPOSITION D'EPDM | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2006 | Translation filed | 10.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 19.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5162441 (NAKATA RIKIZOU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document ** columns 2-4 *; | [X]US2002058759 (OKA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0016] , [0017] , [0039]; example - *; | [X]JP2002275302 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS4710227B ; | [Y]JPS59129242 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPH02252746 (NOK CORP); | [A]JPH0411645 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [A]JPH07330991 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH08188685 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]JP2002363361 (FUJIKURA LTD) |