Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7282609 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2007 | B2 | US2007106080 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | WO2004JP14781 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4887782B | Global Dossier | 29.02.2012 | B2 | JPWO2005035484 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2005514587 | 30.09.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | WO2004JP14781 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011173907 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | JP2011096738 | 25.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1671945 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2007 | A4 | EP1671945 | 21.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | WO2004JP14781 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2539338 | 25.11.2008 | C | CA2539338 | 21.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | WO2004JP14781 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100424069C | 08.10.2008 | C | CN1863765 | 15.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005035484 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100794282B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2008 | B1 | KR20070087029 | 27.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100780906B | Global Dossier | 30.11.2007 | B1 | KR20060102551 | 27.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101270097B | 13.04.2011 | B | CN101270097 | 24.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004136859 | 03.04.2004 | JP2003385936 | 10.10.2003 |