EP1671945 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF 1-ARYL-5-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)-1H- TETRAZOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyobo Co., Ltd. 2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2013/08] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | ||
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states TOYO KASEI KOGYO COMPANY LIMITED 2-6, 1-chome, Dojima-Hama, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIYA, Kazutake, Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited Chemical Research Center, 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760082 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Yasuhiro, Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited Chemical Research Center, 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760082 / JP | 03 /
KOGURO, Kiyoto, Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited Chemical Research Center, 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760082 / JP | 04 /
MITSUI, Sunao, Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited Chemical Research Center, 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760082 / JP | [2006/40] |
Former [2006/25] | 01 /
HAGIYA, K., Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760082 / JP | ||
02 /
SATO, Yasuhiro, Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760082 / JP | |||
03 /
KOGURO, Kiyoto, Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760082 / JP | |||
04 /
MITSUI, Sunao, Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760082 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04788473.9 | 30.09.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004JP14781 | Priority number, date | JP20030385936 | 10.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003385936 | JP20040136859 | 03.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004136859 | [2006/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005035484 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1671945 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C257/02, C07D257/04 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
C07C257/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07C257/00 (KR);
C07D257/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1-ARYL-5-(TRIFLUORMETHYL)-1H-TETRAZOLEN | [2006/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF 1-ARYL-5-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)-1H- TETRAZOLES | [2006/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE 1-ARYL-5-(TRIFLUOROMETHYLE)-1H-TETRAZOLES | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2006 | Translation filed | 16.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SHCHEGEL'SKII, V. F. ET AL, "synthesis and anticholinesterase activity of fluorine-containing arylimino phosphonates and phosphinates", PHARMACEUTICAL CHEMISTRY JOURNAL , 30(11), 690-692, (1996), XP008080757 [A] 1-3 * page 690 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02223745 | [A] - XIAO, J. ET AL, "Synthesis of (trifluoromethyl)tetrazoles via a building block strategy", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY , 99(1), 83-85 CODEN: JFLCAR; ISSN: 0022-1139, (1999), XP002441133 [A] 4-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(99)00122-0 | International search | [Y]JPH05286972 (ZENECA LTD); | [Y]JPS4610526B ; | [Y]JPH09309883 (TOYO KASEI KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]JP2001172248 (NIPPON FINE CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPS4013726B ; | [A]JP2002284770 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES); | [A]JPS63112570 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) |