EP1668318 - FREE-FORM OPTICAL SURFACE MEASURING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENSELMANS, Rens Edenstraat 10 C NL-5615 GA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ROSIELLE, Petrus, Carolus, Johannes, Nicolaas Kapteynlaan 25 NL-5505 AV Veldhoven / NL | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | van Loon, C.J.J. Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J. Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/24] | van Loon, C.J.J. c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 04788506.6 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004NL00672 | Priority number, date | EP20030078094 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03078094 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031255 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668318 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668318 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/04, G01B21/20, G01B9/02, G01M11/02 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G01B9/02021 (EP,US);
G01B21/04 (EP,US);
G01B21/20 (EP,US);
G01B9/02003 (EP,US);
G01B9/02027 (EP,US);
G01B9/02028 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FREIFORM-OBERFLÄCHEN-MESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2006/24] | English: | FREE-FORM OPTICAL SURFACE MEASURING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2006/24] | French: | APPAREIL OPTIQUE DE MESURE DE SURFACES DE FORME LIBRE, ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 15.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2010/16] |
Former [2008/31] | CY | 29.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0398073 (MAUSER WERKE OBERNDORF [DE]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 26 - column 3, line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0512356 (MAUSER WERKE OBERNDORF [DE]) [A] 1-17* column 1, line 51 - column 4, line 10; figure 1 *; | [AD]US6008901 (OHTSUKA MASARU [JP]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document * |