EP1663118 - PEPTIDE-BASED CONDITIONERS AND COLORANTS FOR HAIR, SKIN, AND NAILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Xueying 204 Cherry Blossom Place Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 02 /
WANG, Hong 605 Kazio Court Kennett Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US | 03 /
WU, Ying 717 Scott Lane Wallingford, Pennsylvania 19086 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Leathley, Anna Elisabeth, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Leathley, Anna Elisabeth, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04788667.6 | 08.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US29514 | Priority number, date | US20030501498P | 08.09.2003 Original published format: US 501498 P | US20040562645P | 15.04.2004 Original published format: US 562645 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005025505 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1663118 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/08, A61K38/10, A61K38/16, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K14/00 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
A61Q3/00 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q19/04 (EP);
A61Q5/065 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | A61K8/18, A61K8/99, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, A61K38/16, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K14/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/23] | A61K8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONDITIONIERER UND FÄRBEMITTEL AUF PEPTIDBASIS FÜR HAAR, HAUT UND NÄGEL | [2006/23] | English: | PEPTIDE-BASED CONDITIONERS AND COLORANTS FOR HAIR, SKIN, AND NAILS | [2006/23] | French: | SOINS ET COLORANTS A BASE DE PEPTIDES POUR LES CHEVEUX, LA PEAU ET LES ONGLES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | EP11150381.9 / EP2374465 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0736544 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [A] * claim - *; | [A]US6232287 (RUOSLAHTI ERKKI [US], et al) [A] * claim - *; | [A]US2003152976 (JANSSEN GISELLE G [US], et al) [A] * claim - *; | [E]WO2005117537 (DU PONT [US], et al) [E] 1,4,6,9,11,14,17,20-34,36,37,40,42,44,45,48-50,54* claim - * | International search | [A]US5192332 ; | [X]US5597386 ; | [X]JP2002363026 ; | [AP]WO2004048399 |