EP1663044 - PROBE ASSEMBLY FOR CREATING CIRCUMFERENTIAL LESIONS WITHIN A VESSEL OSTIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/23] | PROBE ASSEMBLY FOR CREATING CIRCUMFERENTIAL LESIONS WITHIN OR AROUND A VESSEL OSTIUM | ||
[2016/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS, INC. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1566 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAIMISTO, Miriam, H. 3065 Bilbo Dr. San Jose, CA 95121 / US | 02 /
KOBLISH, Josef, V. 1568 Partridge CT. Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
TAIMISTO, Miriam, H. 3065 Bilbo Dr. San Jose, CA 95121 / US | ||
02 /
KOBLISH, Josef, V. 3898 Magnolia Dr. No. 14 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2008/36] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 04788843.3 | 16.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US30730 | Priority number, date | US20030672457 | 26.09.2003 Original published format: US 672457 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005030072 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663044 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663044 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00044 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00375 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SONDENANORDNUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON UMFANGSLÄSIONEN IN EIN GEFÄSSOSTIUM | [2016/35] | English: | PROBE ASSEMBLY FOR CREATING CIRCUMFERENTIAL LESIONS WITHIN A VESSEL OSTIUM | [2016/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SONDE POUR LA FORMATION DE LESIONS CIRCONFERENTIELLES AU SEIN D'UN OSTIUM | [2016/35] |
Former [2006/23] | SONDENANORDNUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON UMFANGSLÄSIONEN IN ODER UM EIN GEFÄSSOSTIUM | ||
Former [2006/23] | PROBE ASSEMBLY FOR CREATING CIRCUMFERENTIAL LESIONS WITHIN OR AROUND A VESSEL OSTIUM | ||
Former [2006/23] | DISPOSITIF DE SONDE POUR LA FORMATION DE LESIONS CIRCONFERENTIELLES AU SEIN OU AUTOUR D'UN OSTIUM | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2004 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | NL | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | IE | 16.09.2017 | LU | 16.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.09.2004 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.09.2004 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002111618 (STEWART MARK T [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0085] - [0088] - [0104] - [0111] * [Y] 6; | [X]WO03022167 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8,12,13 * abstract * * page 33, lines 9-17 ** page 72, lines 23-31 *; | [Y]US2003078574 (HALL JEFFREY A [US], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0071] - [0073] - [0082] - [0085] * |