EP1677909 - NOVEL ZEOLITE COMPOSITE, METHOD FOR MAKING AND CATALYTIC APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lummus Technology Inc. 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield NJ 07003-3096 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states ABB LUMMUS GLOBAL INC. 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield, New Jersey 07003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAN, Zhiping 26 Bluff Creek Place The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | 02 /
WALLER, Peter, Wilhelm, Gerhard Prof. Evertslaan 211 NL-2628 XT Delft / NL | 03 /
MAINGAY, Bouden, George Stuyvesantstraat 270 NL-2593 GV, The Hague / NL | 04 /
ANGEVINE, Philip, J. 713 Maegus Drive Woodbury, NJ 08096 / US | 05 /
JANSEN, Jacobus, Cornelis Grabijhof 1 NL-2625 LL Delft / NL | 06 /
YEH, Chuen, Y. 15 Stratford Circle Edison, NJ 08820 / US | 07 /
MASCHMEYER, Thomas 47 Ivy Street Lindfield, NSW 2070 / AU | 08 /
DAUTZENBERG, Frits, M. 5008 Chelterham Terrace San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 09 /
MARCHESE, Leonardo Via Milano, 78 I-19095 Grugliasco / IT | 10 /
PASTORE, Heloise de Oliveira Rua Dr. Quirino, 1770, Apto. 76 CEP-13015-082 Campinas, SP / BR | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
SHAN, Zhiping 26 Bluff Creek Place The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | ||
02 /
WALLER, Peter, Wilhelm, Gerhard Prof. Evertslaan 211 NL-2628 XT Delft / NL | |||
03 /
MAINGAY, Bouden, George Stuyvesantstraat 270 NL-2593 GV, The Hague / NL | |||
04 /
ANGEVINE, Philip, J. 713 Maegus Drive Woodbury, NJ 08096 / US | |||
05 /
JANSEN, Jacobus, Cornelis Grabijhof 1 NL-2625 LL Delft / NL | |||
06 /
YEH, Chuen, Y. 15 Stratford Circle Edison, NJ 08820 / US | |||
07 /
MASCHMEYER, Thomas 47 Ivy Street Lindfield, NSW 2070 / AU | |||
08 /
DAUTZENBERG, Frits, M. 1 Storms Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | |||
09 /
MARCHESE, Leonardo Via Milano, 78 I-19095 Grugliasco / IT | |||
10 /
PASTORE, Heloise de Oliveira Rua Dr. Quirino, 1770, Apto. 76 CEP-13015-082 Campinas, SP / BR | |||
Former [2006/28] | 01 /
SHAN, Zhiping Huntsman Corp., 7114 North Lemar Boulevard Austin, TX 78752 / US | ||
02 /
WALLER, Peter, Wilhelm, Gerhard Prof. Evertslaan 211 NL-2628 XT Delft / NL | |||
03 /
MAINGAY, Bouden, George Stuyvesantstraat 270 NL-2593 GV, The Hague / NL | |||
04 /
ANGEVINE, Philip, J. 713 Maegus Drive Woodbury, NJ 08096 / US | |||
05 /
JANSEN, Jacobus, Cornelis Grabijhof 1 NL-2625 LL Delft / NL | |||
06 /
YEH, Chuen, Y. 15 Stratford Circle Edison, NJ 08820 / US | |||
07 /
MASCHMEYER, Thomas 47 Ivy Street Lindfield, NSW 2070 / AU | |||
08 /
DAUTZENBERG, Frits, M. 1 Storms Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | |||
09 /
MARCHESE, Leonardo Via Milano, 78 I-19095 Grugliasco / IT | |||
10 /
PASTORE, Heloise de Oliveira Rua Dr. Quirino, 1770, Apto. 76 CEP-13015-082 Campinas, SP / BR | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwähe -Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04789352.4 | 30.09.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004US32172 | Priority number, date | US20030691358 | 22.10.2003 Original published format: US 691358 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042148 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677909 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/70, B01J35/10, B01J37/03, C01B33/12 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
C10G11/04 (EP,US);
B01J29/00 (KR);
B01J21/06 (EP,US);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J23/26 (EP,US);
B01J23/38 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/50 (EP,US);
B01J23/52 (EP,US);
B01J29/005 (EP,US);
B01J29/03 (KR);
B01J29/0308 (EP,US);
B01J29/04 (EP,US);
B01J29/084 (EP,US);
B01J29/40 (EP,US);
B01J29/70 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/7007 (EP,US);
B01J29/80 (EP,US);
B01J29/87 (EP,US);
B01J29/88 (EP,US);
B01J29/89 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/617 (EP,US);
B01J35/633 (EP,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,US);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
B01J35/66 (EP,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
B01J37/033 (EP,US);
B01J37/10 (EP,US);
C01B13/366 (EP,US);
C01B33/126 (EP,US);
C01B37/005 (EP,US);
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
C01B39/00 (KR);
C07C2/66 (EP,US);
C07C45/46 (EP,US);
C07D215/227 (EP,US);
C07D301/06 (EP,US);
C07D301/10 (EP,US);
C10G11/05 (EP,US);
C10G2/332 (EP,US);
C10G27/04 (EP,US);
C10G29/205 (EP,US);
C10G45/00 (EP,US);
C10G45/04 (EP,US);
C10G45/12 (EP,US);
C10G45/60 (EP,US);
C10G45/62 (EP,US);
C10G45/64 (EP,US);
C10G45/68 (EP,US);
C10G47/00 (EP,US);
C10G47/14 (EP,US);
C10G47/16 (EP,US);
C10G49/02 (EP,US);
C10G49/08 (EP,US);
C10G50/00 (EP,US);
B01J2229/183 (EP,US);
B01J2229/186 (EP,US);
B01J2229/32 (EP,US);
B01J2229/36 (EP,US);
B01J2229/42 (EP,US);
B01J2229/62 (EP,US);
B01J29/041 (EP,US);
B01J29/166 (EP,US);
B01J29/18 (EP,US);
B01J29/60 (EP,US);
B01J29/65 (EP,US);
B01J29/85 (EP,US);
B01J35/618 (EP,US);
B01J35/638 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1096 (EP,US);
C10G2300/301 (EP,US);
C10G2300/4018 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/66, C07C15/073 (EP,US);
C07C45/46, C07C49/84 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUER ZEOLITHVERBUNDWERKSTOFF, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND KATALYTISCHE ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2006/28] | English: | NOVEL ZEOLITE COMPOSITE, METHOD FOR MAKING AND CATALYTIC APPLICATION THEREOF | [2006/28] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSITE DE ZEOLITHE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET SON APPLICATION CATALYTIQUE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/05] | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0117901 (UNIV DELFT TECH [NL], et al) [X] 1-55 * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 12; example 8; claim - *; | [X]WO0121562 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES], et al) [X] 1-55 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2002131930 (PINNAVAIA THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-55* example 38; claim - *; | [X]WO03045548 (ABB LUMMUS GLOBAL INC [US]) [X] 1-55 * example -; claim - * |