EP1668002 - 2,4-DIOXO-3-QUINAZOLINYLARYL SULFONYLUREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 270 East Grand Avenue Suite 22 South San Francisco California 94080 / US | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCARBOROUGH, Robert, M. 22 Greenbrier Court Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Wolin 872 Arcturus Circle Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
PANDEY, Anjali 4506 Amiens Avenue Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 04 /
BAUER, Shawn, M. 181 Beachview Avenue Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiaoming 1089 Remsen Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 06 /
JIA, Zhaozhong, J. 1576-E Marina Court San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04789522.2 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US32921 | Priority number, date | US20030508564P | 03.10.2003 Original published format: US 508564 P | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005032488 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668002 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668002 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/12, C07D409/14, A61K31/517, A61P7/02 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07D409/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | C07D409/12, A61K31/517, A61P7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | 24.04.2006 | HR | 24.04.2006 | LT | 24.04.2006 | LV | 24.04.2006 | MK | 24.04.2006 | Title | German: | 2,4-DIOXO-3-CHINAZOLINYLARYLSULFONYLHARNSTOFFE | [2006/24] | English: | 2,4-DIOXO-3-QUINAZOLINYLARYL SULFONYLUREAS | [2006/24] | French: | SULFONYLUREES 2,4-DIOXO-3-QUINAZOLINYLARYL | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 13.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.11.2009 | CZ | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | EE | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | RO | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | SI | 11.11.2009 | SK | 11.11.2009 | BG | 11.02.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | [2012/42] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO0157037 (COR THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) |