18.09.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
04.06.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.11.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.09.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
13.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
15.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
01.12.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
19.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
12.05.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
11.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|