Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7584086 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2009 | B2 | US2007027666 | 01.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56894006 | 21.02.2006 | WO2004US32942 | 29.09.2004 | US50733203 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1668561 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US32942 | 29.09.2004 | US50733203 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2538577 | 03.08.2010 | C | CA2538577 | 14.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US32942 | 29.09.2004 | US50733203 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20061871L | 27.04.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2004US32942 | 29.09.2004 | US50733203 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005033739 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2006 | A3 | WO2005033739 | 14.04.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US50733203 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100590637C | 17.02.2010 | C | CN1860489 | 08.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US50733203 | 30.09.2003 |