EP1697617 - GAS TURBINE BLADE SHROUD WITH IMPROVED LEAKAGE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/36] | IMPROVED LEAKAGE CONTROL IN A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | ||
[2015/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. 1000 Marie Victorin, (01BE5) Longueuil, Québec J4G 1A1 / CA | [2015/29] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA INC. 1000 Marie Victorin, (01BE5) Longueuil Québec J4G 1A1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUTRAS, M. 3222 Claude Jodoin Montreal, Quebec H1Y 3M2 / CA | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04789719.4 | 08.10.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004CA01810 | Priority number, date | US20030693961 | 28.10.2003 Original published format: US 693961 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042926 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697617 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697617 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1697617 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/00, F01D11/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D11/006 (EP,US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/55 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US);
F05D2300/5021 (EP,US);
Y10S277/931 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49323 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49764 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49995 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/24] |
Former [2007/05] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DECKBAND EINER GASTURBINE MIT VERBESSERTER LECKSTEUERUNG | [2015/12] | English: | GAS TURBINE BLADE SHROUD WITH IMPROVED LEAKAGE CONTROL | [2015/12] | French: | ENVELOPPE D'AUBE DE TURBINE À GAZ AVEC CONTRÔLE DE FUITE AMELIORÉ | [2015/12] |
Former [2006/36] | VERBESSERTE LECKSTEUERUNG IN EINEM TURBOMOTOR | ||
Former [2006/36] | IMPROVED LEAKAGE CONTROL IN A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | ||
Former [2006/36] | CONTROLE DE FUITE AMELIORE DANS UN MOTEUR A TURBINE | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0058532 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 6-11 * pages 2,3,5,6 * * figures 2,3,7 * * abstract *; | [X]US2003047878 (BOLMS HANS-THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,7,12,13 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0012] , [0014] , [0016] , [0026] , [0027] ** figures 2,5 *; | [XY]WO03027445 (ALSTOM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,12-15 * abstract * * pages 3-6,8-10 * * figures 1a,1b,3,5 * [Y] 6-11 | International search | [A]EP0058532 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]US2003047878 (BOLMS HANS-THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]WO0070192 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO03027445 | US2003047878 | EP0058532 |