EP1678143 - N-SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLYL CARBOXANILIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience Aktiengesellschaft Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNKEL, Ralf 9/11 Rue Pierre DuPont 69001 Lyon / FR | 02 /
ELBE, Hans-Ludwig Dasnöckel 59 42329 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
GREUL, Jörg, Nico Am Sandberg 30 a 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 04 /
HARTMANN, Benoit Färberstr. 1 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 05 /
WACHENDORFF-NEUMANN, Ulrike Oberer Markenweg 85 56566 Neuwied / DE | 06 /
DAHMEN, Peter Altebrückerstr. 61 41470 Neuss / DE | 07 /
KUCK, Karl-Heinz Pastor-Löh-Str. 30a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2006/28] | Application number, filing date | 04790292.9 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004EP11396 | Priority number, date | DE2003149497 | 23.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10349497 | [2006/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005042480 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1678143 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1678143 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1678143 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/16 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
C07C233/07 (EP,US);
C07D231/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07C235/16 (EP,US);
C07D231/16 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-SUBSTITUIERTE PYRAZOLYLCARBOXANILIDE | [2006/28] | English: | N-SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLYL CARBOXANILIDES | [2006/28] | French: | PYRAZOLYLCARBOXANILIDES N-SUBSTITUES | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | HU | 29.06.2011 | IE | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | AT | 12.10.2011 | LU | 12.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
AT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LU | 12.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
AT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LU | 12.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
AT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LU | 12.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
AT | 12.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
AT | 12.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CZ | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CZ | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | EE | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0545099 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO02059086 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [DY] 1-13* the whole document *; | [E]WO2004103975 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [E] 12,13 * Verfahren (f), Seite 26; Verbindungen (III) Seite 3. * |