EP1682956 - A METHOD, DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR EVALUATING AN OBJECT USING A VIRTUAL REPRESENTATION OF SAID OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metris N.V. Interleuvenlaan 15D 3001 Leuven / BE | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN COPPENOLLE, Bart Merellaan 3 B-3210 Linden / BE | 02 /
DE JONGE, Lieven Nijvelsebaan 4 B-3090 Overijse / BE | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Brants, Johan P.E., et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Brants, Johan P.E., et al De Clercq Brants & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 04790399.2 | 14.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004EP11540 | Priority number, date | US20030511491P | 15.10.2003 Original published format: US 511491 P | EP20030447253 | 15.10.2003 Original published format: EP 03447253 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005040944 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682956 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/401 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
G05B19/401 (EP,US);
G01B21/047 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36002 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37066 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37193 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR AUSWERTUNG EINES OBJEKTS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER VIRTUELLEN REPRÄSENTATION DES OBJEKTS | [2006/30] | English: | A METHOD, DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR EVALUATING AN OBJECT USING A VIRTUAL REPRESENTATION OF SAID OBJECT | [2006/30] | French: | PROCEDE, DISPOSITIF ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR EVALUER UN OBJET EN UTILISANT UNE REPRESENTATION VIRTUELLE DUDIT OBJET | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 10.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/22] | 03.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.03.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/22] | Appeal following examination | 02.09.2008 | Appeal received No. T2329/08 | 16.03.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Divisional application(s) | EP08150278.3 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 16.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0244650 (XYGENT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-19,28-30 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 17 * * figure 1; claims 1-3 * [Y] 20-27; | [XA]US2002114537 (SUTULA DANIEL P [US]) [X] 17,18 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1,7,10-15 * [A] 3; | [A]WO0173372 (ROSEN BENGT GOERAN [SE]) [A] 1,11 * page 5, line 1 - page 11, line 9; figures 1-6; claims 8,9 *; | [Y]US2002170192 (STEFFEY KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 20-26 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0051]; figures 2-8 *; | [Y]US2003135474 (CIRCENIS EDGAR [US], et al) [Y] 27 * abstract * * paragraph [0032]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0129624 (BSIS INC [US]) [A] 1,19,28,29 * page 5, line 22 - page 8, line 12; figure 2 *; | [A] - WOCKE P, "KMG AUTOMATISCH PROGRAMMIEREN GENERIERUNG, VISUALISIERUNG UND MODIFIZIERUNG VON ANTASTPUNKTEN UND VERFAHRWEGEN", F & M. FEINWERKTECHNIK MIKROTECHNIK MESSTECHNIK, CARL HANSER GMBH, MUNCHEN, DE, (19940401), vol. 102, no. 4, ISSN 0944-1018, pages 181 - 186, XP000446402 [A] 1,4-8,12-18,29,30 * the whole document * | [A] - "AUTOMATED MANUFACTURING INSPECTION SYSTEM", NTIS TECH NOTES, US DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, (19910201), ISSN 0889-8464, page 179,1,2, XP000224776 [A] 1 * the whole document * |