EP1685305 - HARDWARE FOR A FULLY-GLAZED DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORMA GmbH + Co. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELMER, Hubert Kranebiller Allee 96 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2006/31] | Application number, filing date | 04790665.6 | 20.10.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004EP11857 | Priority number, date | DE2003216238U | 20.10.2003 Original published format: DE 20316238 U | [2006/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005040533 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685305 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/10, E05D5/02, E05D11/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
E05D7/1005 (EP,US);
E05D11/0018 (EP,US);
E05D5/0246 (EP,US);
E05D7/1016 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHLAG FÜR EINE GANZGLASTÜR | [2006/31] | English: | HARDWARE FOR A FULLY-GLAZED DOOR | [2006/31] | French: | FERRURE POUR PORTE TOUT VERRE | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 09.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE8910569U (FLACHGLAS AG, 8510 FUERTH, DE) [DX] 1-6* page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 * |