EP1693534 - STANCHION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Encofrados J. Alsina, S.A. Polígon Industrial Pla d'en Coll Camí de la Font Freda, 1 08110 Montcada i Reixac / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Encofrados J. Alsina, S.A. Poligono Industrial pla d'en Coll, Cami de la Font Freda, 1 08110 Montcada I Reixach / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XAMMAR BOVE, Pedro Pol. Ind. Pla d'en Coll, 1 cami de la Font Freda E-08110 Montcada I Reixac / ES | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Sugrañes, S.L.P. Calle Provenza 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | SUGRANES - VERDONCES - FERREGÜELA 304 Calle Provenza 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 04791388.4 | 27.10.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004ES00469 | Priority number, date | ES20030002547 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: ES 200302547 | [2006/34] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042879 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693534 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04G25/04, E04G17/04 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
E04G25/04 (EP,ES,US);
E04G17/04 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZE | [2006/34] | English: | STANCHION | [2006/34] | French: | ETAI | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2006 | Translation filed | 17.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2221013 (GENDROT FERNAND [FR]); | [A]US5400994 (SHAWWAF KHALED [US], et al); | [A]US2003089050 (TIPPING ELDON [US], et al); | [A]ES1057146U (IRAOLAGOITIA UGALDE SIXTO [ES], et al) | Examination | DE1153705 | by applicant | ES1031628U |