EP1675836 - DERIVATIVES OF 4-PHENYLTHIAZOLES AND THE USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES, PAIN AND EPILEPSY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/27] | DERIVATIVES OF 4-PHENYLTHIAZOLES AND 4-PHENYLIMIDAZOLES AND THE USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES, PAIN AND EPILEPSY | ||
[2015/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPSEN PHARMA 65 Quai Georges Gorse 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2009/11] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Société de Conseils de Recherches et d'Applications Scientifiques ( S.C.R.A.S.) 42, rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHABRIER DE LASSAUNIERE, Pierre-Etienne 134, quai Louis Blériot F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
HARNETT, Jeremiah 32, allée de la Bergerie F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | 03 /
BIGG, Dennis 12, rue des Bénédictines F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | 04 /
LIBERATORE, Anne-Marie 10, rue de la Croix Picard F-78610 Auffargis / FR | 05 /
THURIEAU, Christophe 10 Bld Emile Augier F-75116 Paris / FR | 06 /
DONG, Zheng, Xin 66 Fairview Street Holliston, MA 01746 / US | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Audonnet, Nathalie, et al Ipsen Pharma Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 65 quai Georges Gorse 92650 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | [2016/15] |
Former [2010/33] | Audonnet, Nathalie, et al Ipsen Pharma Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 65 quai Georges Gorse 92650 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/27] | Bourgouin, André Ipsen - S.C.R.A.S., 24, rue Erlanger 75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04791489.0 | 08.10.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004FR02537 | Priority number, date | US20030681002 | 08.10.2003 Original published format: US 681002 | US20040915001 | 10.08.2004 Original published format: US 915001 | [2006/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005035510 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1675836 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1675836 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/28, A61K31/426, A61P25/28, A61P29/00, A61P25/08 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
A61K31/417 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/421 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D233/50 (EP,US);
C07D261/04 (EP,US);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07D277/24 (EP,US);
C07D277/28 (EP,US);
C07D277/34 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/27] | C07D277/28, C07D233/54, C07D417/04, A61K31/427, A61K31/417, A61P25/28, A61P29/00, A61P25/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DERIVATE VON 4-PHENYLTHIAZOLEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENTE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN, SCHMERZEN UND EPILEPSIE | [2015/51] | English: | DERIVATIVES OF 4-PHENYLTHIAZOLES AND THE USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES, PAIN AND EPILEPSY | [2015/51] | French: | DERIVES DU 4-PHENYLTHIAZOLE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES NEURODEGENERATIVES, LA DOULEUR ET L'EPILEPSIE | [2015/51] |
Former [2006/27] | DERIVATE VON 4-PHENYLTHIAZOLEN UND 4-PHENYLIMIDAZOLEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENTE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN, SCHMERZEN UND EPILEPSIE | ||
Former [2006/27] | DERIVATIVES OF 4-PHENYLTHIAZOLES AND 4-PHENYLIMIDAZOLES AND THE USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES, PAIN AND EPILEPSY | ||
Former [2006/27] | DERIVES DU 4-PHENYLTHIAZOLE ET DU 4-PHENYLIMIDAZOLE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES NEURODEGENERATIVES, LA DOULEUR ET L'EPILEPSIE | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.04.2015 | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 06.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2004 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | IE | 08.10.2016 | LU | 08.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.10.2004 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 08.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.10.2004 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 08.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 08.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO0126656 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [DX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02083656 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-10; compounds 3, 79 *; | [X]WO03009843 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [X] 1-5 * compound 5 *; | [PX]WO2004011402 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [PX] 1-10* exemple 1, intermediaire 1.2) page 34 * |