EP1817177 - PNEUMATIC TYRE FOR VEHICLE, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ITS MANUFACTURE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LO PRESTI, Gaetano c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | 02 /
NOTO, Rodolfo c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | 03 /
DE GESE, Ignazio c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | 04 /
POZZATI, Giovanni c/o PRYSMIAN CABLES & SYSTEMS S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | 05 /
LOPREVITE, Massimo c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
LO PRESTI, Gaetano c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
NOTO, Rodolfo c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | |||
03 /
DE GESE, Ignazio c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | |||
04 /
POZZATI, Giovanni c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | |||
05 /
LOPREVITE, Massimo c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Tansini, Elio Fabrizio Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | Tansini, Elio Fabrizio Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04791926.1 | 27.10.2004 | [2007/33] | WO2004IT00592 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006046259 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1817177 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1817177 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, B29D30/30, B29D30/52 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60C9/18 (KR);
B29D30/30 (EP,US);
B29D30/52 (EP,US);
B60C9/00 (KR);
Y10T152/10855 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10864 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN FÜR FAHRZEUG, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2007/33] | English: | PNEUMATIC TYRE FOR VEHICLE, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ITS MANUFACTURE. | [2007/33] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE POUR VEHICULE, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFECTION | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HU | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | IE | 27.10.2011 | LU | 27.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 24.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002046194 ; | [X]DE1228525 (LEMFOERDER KUNSTSTOFF G M B H) [X] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 4; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]DE2160337 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [X] 1,3 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 4; figures 1-3 * [Y] 20; | [XA]US4698245 (SCHALLMEIER GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 11 - line 46 * * column 2, line 30 - line 36 * * figure 1 * [A] 6-12; | [Y]US5211898 (SHINMOTO JITSUMI [JP]) [Y] 47 * column 9, line 23 - line 47; figures 19,20 * * column 5, line 10 - line 17; figures 19,20 *; | [A]US5221406 (LAURENT DANIEL [FR]) [A] 17,32,34,35,47-60 * column 2, line 21 - line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]EP0685352 (SP REIFENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - line 45 * * column 3, line 38 - line 46; figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 46 - line 47 * [Y] 17-19,47; | [A]US5526862 (GHILARDI GIULIANO [IT]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0970797 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 17 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US6458446 (ANDRONACO RONALD V [US], et al) [A] 1,6-12 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1279486 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 17,32,34,35,47-60* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1454732 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 17,32,34,35,47-60 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0050] * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002046194 A 20020212 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 17-20,47 * abstract * | by applicant | DE1228525 | DE2160337 | US4704176 | EP0685352 | EP0970797 | JP2002046194 |