EP1801145 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CURED PRODUCT OF PHOTOSENSITIVE RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation 1-2, Yuraku-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8440 / JP | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA, Yoko 913-25, Matsuoka Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-0909 / JP | 02 /
TOMEBA, Kei, Kurieitohaitsu 103 690-1, Kawanarijima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-0939 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Hiroshi 2-19-13, Kobaracho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka 411-0031 / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04792167.1 | 07.10.2004 | [2007/26] | WO2004JP14870 | Priority number, date | JP20040265446 | 13.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004265446 | [2007/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006030537 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801145 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801145 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B41N1/12, G03F7/004, C08L101/00 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
B41N1/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,US);
C08G18/672 (EP,US);
C08G18/8116 (EP,US);
C08J7/18 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/672, C08G18/40 (US,EP);
C08G18/672, C08G18/48 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2007/26] | C08J5/18, B41N1/12, G03F7/004, // C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEHÄRTETEN PRODUKTS AUS LICHTEMPFINDLICHEM HARZ | [2007/26] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CURED PRODUCT OF PHOTOSENSITIVE RESIN | [2007/26] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A PRODUIRE UN PRODUIT DURCI DE RESINE PHOTOSENSIBLE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2007 | Translation filed | 13.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.2008 | BE | 19.11.2008 | CY | 19.11.2008 | CZ | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | PL | 19.11.2008 | RO | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | TR | 19.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | HU | 20.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1120447 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 5 * paragraph [0035] *; | [X]EP1388578 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 5* paragraphs [0042] - [0045] * | International search | [X]JPH06123966 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK); | [Y]JPH07505840 ; | [X]JPH10120982 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2002275392 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2002356505 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2003026715 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [Y]JP2004174758 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) |