EP1800883 - PRINTING STRUCTURE OF MEDIUM SURFACE ON WHICH DOT PATTERN IS FORMED BY PRINTING AND ITS PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/26] | PRINTING STRUCTURE OF MEDIUM SURFACE ON WHICH DOT PATTERN IS FORMED BY PRINTING, PRINTING METHOD, AND ITS READING METHOD | ||
[2014/12] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshida, Kenji 9-14-2302 Koishikawa 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0002 / JP | [2014/41] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states YOSHIDA, Kenji 9-14-2302 Koishikawa 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04792503.7 | 15.10.2004 | [2007/26] | WO2004JP15286 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040832 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1800883 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800883 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/00, B41F33/00, G06K1/12, H04N1/387 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G06K19/06037 (EP,US);
B41M5/46 (KR);
B41M3/144 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
G06K7/10 (KR);
G06V10/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | DRUCKSTRUKTUR EINER TRÄGERFLÄCHE, AUF DER DURCH DRUCKEN EIN PUNKTMUSTER GEBILDET WIRD UND DRUCKVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/12] | English: | PRINTING STRUCTURE OF MEDIUM SURFACE ON WHICH DOT PATTERN IS FORMED BY PRINTING AND ITS PRINTING METHOD | [2014/12] | French: | STRUCTURE D'IMPRESSION DE SURFACE DE SUPPORT SUR LAQUELLE EST FORMEE UN MOTIF DE POINTS PAR IMPRESSION ET PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION IDOINE | [2014/12] |
Former [2007/26] | DRUCKSTRUKTUR EINER TRÄGERFLÄCHE, AUF DER DURCH DRUCKEN EIN PUNKTMUSTER GEBILDET WIRD, DRUCKVERFAHREN UND LESEVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2007/26] | PRINTING STRUCTURE OF MEDIUM SURFACE ON WHICH DOT PATTERN IS FORMED BY PRINTING, PRINTING METHOD, AND ITS READING METHOD | ||
Former [2007/26] | STRUCTURE D'IMPRESSION DE SURFACE DE SUPPORT SUR LAQUELLE EST FORMEE UN MOTIF DE POINTS PAR IMPRESSION, PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION ET PROCEDE DE LECTURE IDOINE | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | Translation filed | 23.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 18.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14153248.1 / EP2730426 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2015
15.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sonix Technology Co., Ltd. 10F-1, No. 36, Taiyuan Street Chupei City, Hsinchu Taiwan 30265 / TW Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/34] | 12.08.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/22] | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2004 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | IE | 15.10.2014 | LU | 15.10.2014 | BE | 31.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | GR | 09.01.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.10.2004 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | NL | 08.10.2014 | |
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0428828 (JUNG BAYROPA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,9 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 17 *; | JPH0887578 [ ] (YOSHIDA HIROICHI, et al); | [X]EP0730250 (YOSHIDA HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, lines 10-12,30-33,45-58 * * column 4, lines 53-27 *; | [XA]EP1291194 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0021] , [0048] - [0052] * [A] 3,8,10; | [X]WO03056500 (DIGIMARC ID SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 8, lines 16-32 * * page 15, lines 22,23,35-37 *; | [X]DE20121871U (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 3, line 2 - line 24 * * page 5, line 12 - page 8, line 23 *; | WO2004029871 [ ] (YOSHIDA KENJI [JP]); | [E]EP1548635 (YOSHIDA KENJI [JP]) [E] 1-3,8,9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0103] , [0110] - [0113] * | International search | [A]JPH0525555U ; | [A]JPH06111054 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS, et al); | [Y]JPH0887578 (YOSHIDA HIROICHI, et al); | [Y]JPH09106432 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11352605 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2000006512 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [Y]JP2000309154 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001096889 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [Y]JP2001320573 (JGS KK); | [Y]JP2002113937 (KOBAYASHI RECORDING PAPERS MFG); | [Y]JP2002172845 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM); | [Y]JP2003046914 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003256795 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004025865 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG); | [X]WO2004029871 (YOSHIDA KENJI [JP]) |