EP1685779 - SEAT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Tooling Co., Ltd. 1-2-10, Yanoshinmachi Akiku, Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | For all designated states Toyota Boshoku Corporation 1-banchi, 1-chome, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8651 / JP | [2006/33] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Toyota Boshoku Corporation 1-banchi, 1-chome, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8651 / JP | ||
For all designated states TD Laboratory Co. Ltd. 5-8, Aza Matakichibora, Oaza Nishinakayama, Fujioka-cho Nishikamo-gun Aichi 470-0431 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Etsunori@c/o Delta Tooling Co., Ltd. 1-2-10, Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Atsuki@c/o TOYOTA Boshoku Corporation 1, Toyoda-cho 1-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8651 / JP | 03 /
NISHIURA, Takeshi@c/o TOYOTA Boshoku Corporation 1, Toyoda-cho 1-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8651 / JP | [2016/36] |
Former [2006/31] | 01 /
FUJITA, Etsunori c/o Delta Tooling Co., Ltd. 1-2-10, Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | ||
02 /
SASAKI, Atsuki c/o TOYOTA Bohuko Corporation 1, Toyoda-cho 1-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448.8651 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIURA, Takeshi c/o TOYOTA Boshuko Corporation 1, Toyoda-cho 1-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 4488651 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/36] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04793076.3 | 21.10.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004JP15964 | Priority number, date | JP20030361186 | 21.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003361186 | [2006/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005037020 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685779 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1685779 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/50, B60N2/66, B60N2/16, B60N2/44, A47C7/28, B60N2/54, B60N2/22 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
A47C7/28 (EP,US);
B60N2/667 (US);
B60N2/1605 (EP,US);
B60N2/164 (US);
B60N2/22 (US);
B60N2/50 (US);
B60N2/544 (US);
B60N2/66 (EP,US);
B60N2/6673 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/31] | A47C7/28, A47C7/46, A47C7/14, B60N2/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SITZSTRUKTUR | [2006/31] | English: | SEAT STRUCTURE | [2006/31] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SIEGE | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2006 | Translation filed | 11.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2004 | AT | 07.09.2016 | BE | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | IE | 21.10.2016 | LU | 21.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.10.2004 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.10.2016 | ||
LU | 21.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.10.2016 | ||
LU | 21.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2837436 (CERA [FR]) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS592243U ; | [A]JPS5936755U ; | [Y]JPH03200438 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH05245015 (SHIROKI CORP); | [Y]JPH0572250U ; | [Y]JPH05330360 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH09109757 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [Y]JPH09238776 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH10146240 (TS TEC KK); | [Y]JP2001150988 (NANBA PRESS KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2003182427 (DELTA TOOLING CO LTD) | Examination | DE4008936 |