EP1690937 - METHOD OF CONSTRUCTING TRANSGENIC DENDRITIC CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dnavec Research Inc. 25-11 Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKANO, Shinji 15-3-301, Yoshizuka 4-chome Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-0041 / JP | 02 /
YONEMITSU, Yoshikazu 5-31-3, Najima Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 813-0043 / JP | 03 /
SUEISHI, Katsuo 1-29-22, Oike Minami-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 815-0073 / JP | 04 /
SHIBATA, Satoko 2-14-15-701, Hakomatsu Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-0061 / JP | 05 /
HASEGAWA, Mamoru, c/o DNAVEC RESEARCH INC. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | [2012/42] |
Former [2006/33] | 01 /
OKANO, Shinji 15-3-301, Yoshizuka 4-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-0041 / JP | ||
02 /
YONEMITSU, Yoshikazu 5-31-3, Najima, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 813-0043 / JP | |||
03 /
SUEISHI, Katsuo 1-29-22, Oike, Minami-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 815-0073 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIBATA, Satoko 2-14-15-701, Hakomatsu, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-0061 / JP | |||
05 /
HASEGAWA, Mamoru, c/o DNAVEC RESEARCH INC. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04793197.7 | 29.10.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004JP16089 | Priority number, date | JP20030374808 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003374808 | JP20040187028 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004187028 | [2006/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042737 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1690937 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1690937 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N5/16, A61K39/00, A61K48/00, A61P35/00 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP,KR);
A61K39/4622 (EP,KR);
A61K39/464456 (EP,KR);
A61K39/464491 (EP,KR);
A61K39/464499 (EP,KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N5/16 (KR);
A61K2039/5156 (US);
A61K2239/57 (EP,KR);
C12N2510/02 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18843 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONSTRUKTION EINER TRANSGENEN DENDRITISCHEN ZELLE | [2006/33] | English: | METHOD OF CONSTRUCTING TRANSGENIC DENDRITIC CELL | [2006/33] | French: | METHODE DE CONSTRUCTION D'UNE CELLULE DENDRITIQUE TRANSGENIQUE | [2006/33] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2006/33: The applicant has requested a correction according to Rule 88 EPC | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2006 | Translation filed | 30.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.03.2012 | 06.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2004 | AT | 17.10.2012 | BE | 17.10.2012 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | DK | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | IT | 17.10.2012 | NL | 17.10.2012 | PL | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | TR | 17.10.2012 | IE | 29.10.2012 | LU | 29.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | ES | 28.01.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
LU | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1186667 (DNAVEC RESEARCH INC [JP]) [Y] 13,14 * Page 2 lines 31-35 *; | [Y] - JIN CH ET AL, "Recombinant Sendai virus provides a highly efficient gene transfer into human cord blood-derived hematopoietic stem Cells", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, (200302), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 272 - 277, XP002983185 [Y] 1-14 * Abstract Page 274 col 1 lines 1-15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301877 | [Y] - CREMER I ET AL, "Inhibition of human immunodeficiency virus transmission to CD4+ T cells after gene transfer of constitutively expressed interferon beta to dendritic cells", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (20000810), vol. 11, no. 12, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 1695 - 1703, XP002406342 [Y] 1-12 * Abstract Page 1696 col 2 lines 33-50 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10430340050111340 | [Y] - STEITZ J ET AL, "Depletion of CD25+ CD4+ T cells and treatment with tyrosinase-related protein 2-transduced dendritic cells enhance the interferon alpha-induced, CD8+ T-cell-dependent immune defense of B16 melanoma", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20011215), vol. 61, no. 24, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 8643 - 8646, XP002396933 [Y] 13,14 * Abstract * | [A] - STEINMAN R M, "DENDRITIC CELLS AND IMMUNE-BASED THERAPIES", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199607), vol. 24, no. 8, ISSN 0301-472X, pages 859 - 862, XP000999716 [A] 1-14 * Abstract Page 859 col 2 lines 33-40 * | International search | [Y] - JIN, CH. ET AL., "Recombinant Sendai virus provides a highly efficient gene transfer into human cord blood-derived hematopoietic stem Cells", GENE THER., (200302), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 272 - 277, XP002983185 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301877 | [Y] - JONULEIT, H. ET AL., "Efficient transduction of mature CD83+ dendritic cells using recombinant adenovirus suppressed T cell stimulatory capacity", GENE THER., (2000), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 249 - 254, XP002983186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301077 | [Y] - SUMIMOTO, H. ET AL., "Rapid and efficient generation of lentivirally gene-modified dendritic cells from DC progenitors with bone marrow stromal cells", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2002), vol. 271, no. 1-2, pages 153 - 165, XP004393934 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(02)00342-3 | [Y] - LUNDQVIST, A. ET AL., "Nonviral and viral gene transfer into different subsets of human dendritic cells yield comparable efficiency of transfection", J IMMUNOTHER., (2002), vol. 25, no. 6, pages 445 - 454, XP002983187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002371-200211000-00001 | [Y] - OKANO, S. ET AL., "Recombinant Sendai virus vectors for activated T lymphocytes", GENE THER., (200308), vol. 10, no. 16, pages 1381 - 1391, XP002973825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301998 | [A] - SASAKI, K. ET AL., "Efficient and stable Sendai virus-mediated gene transfer into primate embryonic cells with pluripotency preserved", GENE THER., (2003), vol. 10, pages 1381 - 1391, XP002973825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301998 | by applicant | JPS6230752B | JPS6230753B | JPS6233879B | JPS6474982 | JPH01285498 | JPH05192160 | JPH05252965 | JPH07502173 | WO9716539 | WO9716538 | WO9732010 | US5744144 | US5798100 | WO0070055 | WO0070070 | EP1067179 | WO0104272 | - MOL. THER., (2002), pages 283 - 290 | - J IMMUNOTHERAPY, (2002), vol. 25, pages 445 - 454 | - GENE THERAPY, (2000), vol. 7, pages 249 - 254 | - "Paramyxoviridae: The viruses and their replication", LAMB, R.A.; KOLAKOFSKY, D., Fields of Virology, LIPPINCOTT - RAVEN PUBLISHERS, (1996), vol. 2, pages 1177 - 1204 | - YU, D. ET AL., GENES CELLS, (1997), vol. 2, pages 457 - 466 | - HASAN, M. K. ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1997), vol. 78, pages 2813 - 2820 | - KATO, A. ET AL., EMBO J., (1997), vol. 16, pages 578 - 587 | - GRAHAM, F. L.; VAN DER EB, J., VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, page 456 | - WIGLER, M.; SILVERSTEIN, S., CELL, (1977), vol. 11, page 223 | - CHEN, C.; OKAYAMA, H., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 7, page 2745 | - CALOS, M. P., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 3015 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 3015 | - KATO, A. ET AL., GENES CELLS, (1996), vol. 1, pages 569 - 579 | - "Hemaggulutinating virus of Japan-liposome-mediated gene delivery to vascular cells", YONEMITSU, Y; KANEDA, Y, Molecular Biology of Vascular Diseases. Method in Molecular Medicine, HUMANA PRESS, (1999), pages 295 - 306 |