EP1678178 - NOVEL DIAZASPIROALKANES AND THEIR USE FOR TREATMENT OF CCR8 MEDIATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2006/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLADH, Hakan AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 02 /
CONNOLLY, Stephen, AstraZeneca R & D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 03 /
DYKE, Hazel Joan, Argenta Discovery Ltd. 8/9 Spire Green Centre Flex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | 04 /
LISIUS, Annea AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 05 /
PRICE, Stephen, Argenta Discovery Ltd. 8/9 Spire Green Centre Flex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | 06 /
SHAMOVSKY, Igor AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 07 /
VAN DEN HEUVEL, Marco, Argenta Discovery Ltd. 8/9 Spire Green Centre Flex Meadow Harlow Essex CM19 5TR / GB | [2006/28] | Application number, filing date | 04793824.6 | 21.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004SE01522 | Priority number, date | SE20030002811 | 23.10.2003 Original published format: SE 0302811 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005040167 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1678178 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/10, A61K31/438, A61P11/06 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
C07D471/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | 23.05.2006 | LT | 23.05.2006 | LV | 23.05.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE DIAZASPIROALKANE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON DURCH CCR8 VERMITTELTEN KRANKHEITEN | [2006/28] | English: | NOVEL DIAZASPIROALKANES AND THEIR USE FOR TREATMENT OF CCR8 MEDIATED DISEASES | [2006/28] | French: | NOUVEAUX DIAZASPIROALCANES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES INDUITES PAR CCR8 | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1061076 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO03037271 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) |