EP1678441 - LINEAR FLUORESCENT HIGH-BAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/28] | LINEAR FLUORESCENT HIGH-BAY | ||
[2016/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | [2016/03] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | ||
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states RUUD LIGHTING, INC. 9201 Washington Avenue Racine, WI 53406 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUGAARD, Eric, J. 3818 - 5th Avenue Kenosha, WI 53140 / US | 02 /
RALEIGH, Craig 9258 Millstone Drive Racine, WI 53406 / US | 03 /
RUUD, Alan, J. 3057 Michigan Blvd. Racine, WI 53402 / US | 04 /
BUCHANAN, Dallas, I. 219 Foster Avenue Kentfield, CA 94904 / US | [2007/33] |
Former [2006/28] | 01 /
HAUGAARD, Eric, J. 3818 - 5th Avenue Kenosha, WI 53140 / US | ||
02 /
RALEIGH, Craig 9258 Millstone Drive Racine, WI 53406 / US | |||
03 /
RUUD, Alan, J. 3057 Michigan Blvd. Racine, WI 53402 / US | |||
04 /
BUCHANAN, Dallas, I. 2708 Simpson Street Evanston, IL 60201 / US | Representative(s) | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2016/03] |
Former [2009/45] | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher - Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/28] | Kroher, Jürgen Kroher - Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04794045.7 | 04.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004US32542 | Priority number, date | US20030679228 | 02.10.2003 Original published format: US 679228 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005033577 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1678441 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1678441 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1678441 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, F21S8/00, F21V17/00, // F21Y103/00, F21Y113/00 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
F21S8/06 (EP,US);
F21V14/02 (EP,US);
F21V14/04 (EP,US);
F21V15/015 (EP,US);
F21V17/002 (EP,US);
F21V23/02 (EP,US);
F21V23/0471 (EP,US);
F21V29/502 (EP,US);
F21V7/0016 (EP,US);
F21V7/005 (EP,US);
F21V7/0091 (EP,US);
F21V7/10 (EP,US);
F21V7/24 (EP,US);
F21V17/104 (EP,US);
F21V17/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | F21V7/00, F21S8/06, // F21Y103/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/28] | F21K2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LINEARE FLUORESZENZ-HALLENBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/07] | English: | LINEAR FLUORESCENT HIGH-BAY | [2016/07] | French: | LUMINAIRE A SOURCES LINEAIRES FLUORESCENTES POUR ESPACES DE GRANDE HAUTEUR | [2015/34] |
Former [2006/28] | LINEARES FLUORESZENZ-HOCHGEWÖLBE | ||
Former [2006/28] | LINEAR FLUORESCENT HIGH-BAY | ||
Former [2006/28] | HAUTE BAIE FLUORESCENTE LINEAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.01.2016 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | EP13152952.1 / EP2587130 | EP13152953.9 / EP2587131 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2004 | AT | 20.01.2016 | BE | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | IT | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | GB | 04.10.2016 | IE | 04.10.2016 | LU | 04.10.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.10.2004 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
GB | 04.10.2016 | ||
IE | 04.10.2016 | ||
LU | 04.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
GB | 04.10.2016 | ||
IE | 04.10.2016 | ||
LU | 04.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
GB | 04.10.2016 | ||
LU | 04.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR866082 (ALPHONSE FERDINAN PIEPER) [X] 1-3,13,19 * page 3, line 58 - line 77 * * figures 4,6 * [I] 4-12,14-18,20-23; | GB543390 [ ] (ALPHONSE FERDINAND PIEPER); | [XI]US2329268 (PAUL HEATH WILFRID) [X] 1-3,13,19 * the whole document * [I] 16; | [X]WO0113039 (NSI ENTPR INC [US]) [X] 1-3,13,19 * page 6, line 11 - line 18 * * page 11, line 34 - page 12, line 7 * * figures 1,7,8 *; | [XI]US6543912 (SIMON JEROME H [US]) [X] 1-3,13,19-23 * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 21 * * column 7, line 42 - line 56 * * figures 1-13,16-19 * [I] 4-12,14-18; | [XI]WO03056234 (COOPER TECHNOLOGIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1,13,19-20 * page 9, line 9 - page 11, line 27 * * figures 10-16 * [I] 2-12,14-18,21-23 | International search | [A]US1451893 (ARCY RYAN WALTER D); | [A]US4263639 (SCHACHT LOUIS L); | [X]US4599684 (LEE RICHARD H [US]); | [A]US5526244 (BISHOP VERNON R [US]); | [Y]US5946209 (ECKEL DAVID PHILIP [US], et al); | [X]US5962989 (BAKER JAMES ALLAN [CA]); | [Y]US6250772 (ENTROP JEAN P [NL], et al); | [X]US6382817 (CHELF BENTLEY [US]); | [X]US6561678 (LOUGHREY JAMES F [US]) | Examination | JP2007157690 | JP2007273205 | by applicant | FR866082 |