EP1678704 - A HIGH-VOLTAGE PULSE DRIVER WITH CAPACITIVE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Nanotech Holdings, Inc. Suite 107 3006 Longhorn Boulevard Austin, TX 78758 / US | [2008/46] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Nano-Proprietary, Inc. Suite 107, 3006 Longhorn Boulevard Austin, TX 78758 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIKHONSKI, Alexei 2222 Clover Ridge Drive Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | 02 /
VISEL, Thomas 11250 Taylor Draper Lane, 422 Austin, Texas 78759 / US | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/28] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04794618.1 | 08.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004US33318 | Priority number, date | US20030510284P | 10.10.2003 Original published format: US 510284 P | US20040956598 | 01.10.2004 Original published format: US 956598 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005036746 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1678704 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1678704 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, H01H47/32, H01H9/00, H01H51/00, H01H47/00 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
H03K17/102 (EP,US);
H03K3/013 (KR);
H03K17/6872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHSPANNUNGS-IMPULSTREIBER MIT KAPAZITIVER KOPPLUNG | [2006/28] | English: | A HIGH-VOLTAGE PULSE DRIVER WITH CAPACITIVE COUPLING | [2006/28] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE A IMPULSIONS HAUTE TENSION A COUPLAGE CAPACITIF | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2011 | BE | 11.05.2011 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | GB | 08.10.2011 | IE | 08.10.2011 | LU | 08.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 12.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3823330 (RAPP A) [A] 1,7,8 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4384287 (SAKUMA HIRAKU [JP]) [A] 1,7,8 * figures 3,4,6 * * column 4, line 2 - line 61 *; | [A]EP0456311 (PHILIPS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,7,8 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, lines 11-19 * * column 1, lines 42-46 * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 28 *; | [A]US6049228 (MOON SEUNG-HWAN [KR]) [A] 1,7,8 * figures 3,4 * * columns 3,4 *; | [PA]EP1450340 (FUJITSU HITACHI PLASMA DISPLAY [JP]) [PA] 1,7,8* figure 18 * | International search | [XP]US2004104875 (KIM HYONG-RAE [KR], et al); | [XE]US2005156854 (PARK JAE-HO [KR], et al); | [XE]US2005156863 (KIM KEE-JONG [KR]); | [XE]US2005168427 (ODOM PHILIP [US]) |