EP1675752 - VEHICLE DISABLEMENT SYSTEM USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Payment Protection Systems, Inc. Suite B, 42181 Avenida Alvarado Temecula, CA 92590 / US | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Michael, P. 7921 Mickelson Way Hemet, California 92545 / US | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2006/27] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04794771.8 | 13.10.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004US33504 | Priority number, date | US20030511084P | 15.10.2003 Original published format: US 511084 P | US20040958450 | 06.10.2004 Original published format: US 958450 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005039929 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1675752 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/00, G07C5/10 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
B60R25/00 (EP,US);
G07C5/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | G06Q10/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/27] | B60R1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZER-SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR FAHRZEUGSPERRSYSTEM | [2006/27] | English: | VEHICLE DISABLEMENT SYSTEM USER INTERFACE | [2006/27] | French: | INTERFACE-UTILISATEUR POUR SYSTEME DE MISE HORS SERVICE DE VEHICULE | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 06.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/10] | 22.10.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2091865 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 73 - line 82 * * abstract *; | [A]US5532690 (HERTEL RICHARD J [US]) [A] 1-7* column 6, line 35 - line 39 *; | [A]US5821479 (KONDO ATSUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, paragraphs 2-4 *; | [XD]US6195648 (SIMON FRANK [US], et al) [XD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1130554 (INT GAME TECH [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US6195648 (SIMON FRANK [US], et al) |