EP1673219 - LIQUIDPROOF SEAM FOR PROTECTIVE APPAREL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNON, Greg, E. 200 Jess Pusey Drive Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 02 /
HARDIE, William, G. 310 Norwich Lane Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Timothy, J. 254 Sloan Ct. Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2006/36] |
Former [2006/26] | 01 /
HANNON, Greg, E. 26 Bristol Lane Newark, DE 19711 / US | ||
02 /
HARDIE, William, G. 310 Norwich Lane Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Timothy, J. 254 Sloan Ct. Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2006/26] | Wilson, Gary, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04795102.5 | 14.10.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004US33896 | Priority number, date | US20030686248 | 15.10.2003 Original published format: US 686248 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005037542 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1673219 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1673219 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B25/10, B32B3/10 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
A43B23/06 (EP,US);
A41D15/005 (EP,US);
A41D27/24 (EP,US);
A43B7/125 (EP,US);
B29C65/5042 (EP,US);
B29C65/62 (EP,US);
B29C65/72 (EP,US);
B29C66/0224 (EP,US);
B29C66/133 (EP,US);
B29C66/1352 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/431 (EP,US);
B29C66/72343 (EP,US);
B29C66/7292 (EP,US);
B29C66/73187 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C65/484 (EP,US);
B29C65/505 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
B29C66/135 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2075/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSDICHTE NAHT FÜR SCHUTZKLEIDUNG | [2006/26] | English: | LIQUIDPROOF SEAM FOR PROTECTIVE APPAREL | [2006/26] | French: | COUTURE ETANCHE AUX LIQUIDES POUR VETEMENT PROTECTEUR | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 30.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.2009 | BE | 07.01.2009 | CY | 07.01.2009 | CZ | 07.01.2009 | DK | 07.01.2009 | EE | 07.01.2009 | FI | 07.01.2009 | NL | 07.01.2009 | PL | 07.01.2009 | RO | 07.01.2009 | SI | 07.01.2009 | SK | 07.01.2009 | TR | 07.01.2009 | BG | 07.04.2009 | GR | 08.04.2009 | ES | 18.04.2009 | PT | 08.06.2009 | HU | 08.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
HU | 08.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0063007 (GORE W L & ASS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * Method of joining laminated sheets in footwear article. Tape applied over seam.; page 6, line 14 - page 10, line 3 * * page 11, line 24 - page 13, line 28 * * claim 1 ** figure 6 *; | [A]US2002078593 (PAVELESCU LIVIU MIHAI [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * Laminated shoe upper with lining material removed at portion forming joint with sole.; paragraphs [0011] - [0015] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6514590 (SHIH ARTHUR TSESHAO [US]) [A] 1-15 * Method of joining rubber sheets. * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 27 * * figures 3,4 * |