EP1677799 - TRIAZOLO-PYRIDAZINE COMPOUNDS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF NEUROPATHIC PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBSACK, Alec D. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
MUNOZ, Benito 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
PRACITTO, Richard 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
VENKATRAMAN, Shankar 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
WANG, Bowei 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
GUNZNER, Janet 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2006/28] | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co.,Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04795608.1 | 15.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004US34466 | Priority number, date | US20030513046P | 21.10.2003 Original published format: US 513046 P | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005041971 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677799 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5025, C07D237/32, C07D237/34, C07D487/04 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | 22.05.2006 | LV | 22.05.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRIAZOLO-PYRIDAZIN-VERBINDUNGEN UND DERIVATE DAVON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEUROPATHISCHEN SCHMERZEN | [2006/28] | English: | TRIAZOLO-PYRIDAZINE COMPOUNDS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF NEUROPATHIC PAIN | [2006/28] | French: | COMPOSES DE TRIAZOLO-PYRIDAZINE ET LEURS DERIVES, DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR NEUROPATHIQUE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 24.11.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO0242305 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al); | [Y]US2003176449 (BLACKABY WESLEY PETER [GB], et al) | [XP] - LEBSACK A.D. ET AL, "Identification and Synthesis of [1,2,4]triazolo[3,4-a]phthalazine derivatives as high-affinity ligands to the a2delta-1 subunit of voltage gated calcium channel", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (200405), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 2463 - 2467, XP002985251 |