EP1673630 - MN/CA IX AND CANCER PROGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUTE OF VIROLOGY Slovak Academy of Sciences, Dubravska Cesta 9 842 46 Bratislava / SK | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERT, Matthias Lentkestrasse 57 39116 Magdeburg / DE | 02 /
ROCKEN, Christoph Brunnerstrasse 24 39112 Magdeburg / DE | 03 /
PASTOREKOVA, Silvia Novoveska 18 841 07 Bratislava / SK | 04 /
ZAVADA, Jan Na pekne vyhlidce 1 162 00 Prague / CZ | 05 /
PASTOREK, Jaromir Novoveska 18 841 07 Bratislava / SK | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Behnisch, Werner, et al ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Behnisch, Werner, et al Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Froud, Clive Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford Kent TN30 6UG / GB | ||
Former [2006/26] | Froud, Clive Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden GB-Kent TN30 6UG / GB | Application number, filing date | 04795702.2 | 18.10.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004US34573 | Priority number, date | US20030511832P | 16.10.2003 Original published format: US 511832 P | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005037083 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1673630 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/534, G01N33/574 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/5748 (EP,US);
C07K14/82 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/26] | G01N33/534 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MN/CA IX UND KREBSPROGNOSE | [2006/26] | English: | MN/CA IX AND CANCER PROGNOSIS | [2006/26] | French: | MN/AC IX ET PRONOSTIC DU CANCER | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 20.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - J. HOFFMANN ET AL, "Carbonic Anhydrase IX (CA9) Expression in Gastric Cancer is Associated with Enhanced Invasion and Poor Prognosis", HELICOBACTER, online, (20040909), vol. 9, no. 5, page 492, XP002407342 [PX] 1-11 * abstract * | [PX] - BIRNER PETER ET AL, "Expression of hypoxia-related tissue factors correlates with diminished survival of adjuvantly treated patients with chromosome 1p aberrant oligodendroglial neoplasms and therapeutic implications.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. 1 OCT 2004, (20041001), vol. 10, no. 19, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 6567 - 6571, XP002407933 [PX] 1-3,5,7-11 * page 6569, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-0617 | [DA] - LEPPILAMPI MARI ET AL, "Carbonic anhydrase isozymes IX and XII in gastric tumors.", WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY : WJG. JUL 2003, (200307), vol. 9, no. 7, ISSN 1007-9327, pages 1398 - 1403, XP009074813 [DA] 1-11 * abstract * | [DA] - SAARNIO JUHA ET AL, "Transmembrane carbonic anhydrase, MN/CA IX, is a potential biomarker for biliary tumours.", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, (200111), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 0168-8278, pages 643 - 649, XP002407344 [DA] 1-11 * page 645, column R, paragraph 4 - page 647, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-8278(01)00193-3 | [AD] - POTTER C P S ET AL, "Diagnostic, prognostic and therapeutic implications of carbonic anhydrases in cancer.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20030707), vol. 89, no. 1, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 2 - 7, XP002407934 [AD] 1-11 * page 3, column R, paragraph 3 - page 6, column R, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.BJC.6600936 | International search | [X]US6027887 (ZAVADA JAN [CZ], et al) |