EP1784709 - MULTI-PLANAR THREE-DIMENSIONAL USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEIN, Christopher, Alan One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
OSTOJIC, Bojana One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
FONG, Jeffrey, C. One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
SANDS, Kort, Danner One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 05 /
GIBSON, Mark, R. One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP Rosental 4 80331 München / DE | [2015/09] |
Former [2011/49] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Gemany LLP Maximilianstraße 13 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04795904.4 | 19.10.2004 | [2007/20] | WO2004US34804 | Priority number, date | US20040909838 | 03.08.2004 Original published format: US 909838 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006022770 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1784709 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784709 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/00, G06F9/00, H04N5/445 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04815 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | G06F3/00, G06F9/00, H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | MEHRPLANARE DREIDIMENSIONALE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE | [2007/20] | English: | MULTI-PLANAR THREE-DIMENSIONAL USER INTERFACE | [2007/20] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR TRIDIMENSIONNELLE MULTI-PLANS | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2005 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2004 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IE | 19.10.2015 | LU | 19.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.10.2004 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IE | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IE | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6473751 (NIKOLOVSKA LIRA [NL], et al) [X] 1-37 * column 8, line 42 - line 49 * * column 10, line 41 - line 53 ** column 11, line 36 - line 67 * | International search | [Y]US5754809 (GANDRE JERRY D [US]); | [Y]US6229542 (MILLER JOHN DAVID [US]); | [Y]US5861822 (PARK CHAN KYUNG [KR], et al); | [A]US5956035 (SCIAMMARELLA EDUARDO [US], et al) | [Y] - MICROSOFT, MICROSOFT WORD 2000, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, VERSION 9.0.6926 SP-3, (1999), XP008163283 |