EP1687363 - BROMINE, CHLORINE OR IODINE FUNCTIONAL POLYMER ELECTROLYTES CROSSLINKED BY E-BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANDRASITS, Michael A. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HAMROCK, Steven J. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HINTZER, Klaus Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
THALER, Arne Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
FUKUSHI, Tatsuo Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
JING, Naiyong Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
LOCHHAAS, Kai H. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04795931.7 | 20.10.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004US34835 | Priority number, date | US20030712590 | 13.11.2003 Original published format: US 712590 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052041 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687363 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687363 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/22, C08J3/28, C08F214/26, B01D71/36 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
C08J5/225 (EP,US);
C08J5/22 (KR);
B01D67/009 (EP,US);
B01D71/00 (KR);
B01D71/32 (EP,US);
B01D71/82 (EP,US);
C08F114/26 (EP,US);
C08F214/26 (KR);
C08J3/28 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M8/1072 (EP,US);
H01M8/1088 (EP,US);
C08J2327/18 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONENSTRAHLVERNETZTE BROM-, CHLOR- ODER IODFUNKTIONELLE POLYMERELEKTROLYTE | [2006/32] | English: | BROMINE, CHLORINE OR IODINE FUNCTIONAL POLYMER ELECTROLYTES CROSSLINKED BY E-BEAM | [2006/32] | French: | ELECTROLYTES POLYMERES FONCTIONNELS DE BROME, DE CHLORE OU D'IODE DURCIS PAR FAISCEAU ELECTRONIQUE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 29.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | IE | 20.10.2009 | LU | 20.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GB | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.10.2009 | ||
LU | 20.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GB | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.10.2009 | ||
LU | 20.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GB | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GB | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GB | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4169023 (SATA TOSHIKATSU, et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [AD]US5260351 (LOGOTHETIS ANESTIS L [US]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5330626 (BANERJEE SHOIBAL [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 34; examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1179548 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1238999 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0026]; examples 1,2; claims 1-11 * |