EP1685188 - ETHYLENE COPOLYMER MODIFIED ORIENTED POLYESTER FILMS, TAPES, FIBERS AND NONWOVEN TEXTILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLLAND, Loic, Pierre 98 Chemin du Recredoz, Vesenex F-01220 Divonne Les Bains / FR | 02 /
SAMUELS, Sam, Louis 34 Pelham Drive Landenberg, Pennsylvania 19350 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04796098.4 | 20.10.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004US35044 | Priority number, date | US20030513365P | 21.10.2003 Original published format: US 513365 P | US20040550437P | 05.03.2004 Original published format: US 550437 P | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005040257 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685188 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L67/00, D01F6/92 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L23/0869 (EP,US);
C08L23/0876 (EP,US);
C08L23/0884 (EP,US);
C08L73/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23993 (US);
Y10T428/2913 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L67/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/04] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETHYLENCOPOLYMERMODIFIZIERTE ORIENTIERTE POLYESTERFOLIEN, -BÄNDER, -FASERN UND -VLIESSTOFFE | [2006/31] | English: | ETHYLENE COPOLYMER MODIFIED ORIENTED POLYESTER FILMS, TAPES, FIBERS AND NONWOVEN TEXTILES | [2006/31] | French: | FILMS, RUBANS, FIBRES ET TEXTILES NON TISSES EN POLYESTER ORIENTES MODIFIES PAR COPOLYMERES ETHYLENIQUES | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH06257014 ; | [X]JPH08231835 ; | [X]JPH0977960 ; | [A]JP2003238786 ; | [X]JPS62250223 ; | [X]JPH01165626 ; | [X]JPH10101909 ; | [X]JPH02274759 ; | [X]US4281079 (BAER MASSIMO) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 3 - line 14 * * column 3, line 54 - line 57 * * examples 10-12,18 *; | [DA]US4609710 (IOHARA KOHICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 8-13 * column 2, line 32 - line 62 * * column 3, line 33 - line 39 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9600752 (FOSTER MILLER INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 21 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0708148 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 3, line 13 - line 33; examples 4-7,9,13,14,17 *; | [X]EP0737707 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 18 - line 33 * * page 10, line 29 - line 43 * * page 11, line 26 - line 29 * * page 12, line 1 - line 8 * * examples 1,2,4-10,12,13,15-18.20,22,23; claim 19 *; | [X]WO9725459 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 8-13 * examples 33,34 *; | [A]WO02063079 (INEOS ACRYLICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 8-13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02102898 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 5 - line 16 * * page 6, line 14 - line 27 * * page 7, line 3 - page 9, line 25 * * examples 1,2 *; | [X]WO03082980 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 6, line 19 - line 25 * * page 7, line 3 - line 4 * * page 13, line 7 - page 15, line 6 * * examples 1-4,6-11; claim - *; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 41, Database accession no. 1994-330582, XP002320908 & JPH06257014 A 19940913 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 8,10 * abstract * [A] 9,11-13 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 46, Database accession no. 1996-461503, XP002320909 & JPH08231835 A 19960910 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 16, Database accession no. 1997-241905, XP002320910 & JPH0977960 A 19970325 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 17, Database accession no. 2004-172163, XP002320911 & JP2003238786 A 20030827 (OKURA IND CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 49, Database accession no. 1987-345747, XP002320912 & JPS62250223 A 19871031 (KANEBO LTD) [X] 8-13 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 32, Database accession no. 1989-230887, XP002320913 & JPH01165626 A 19890629 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 77, Database accession no. 1997-404714, XP002320914 & JPH10101909 A 19980421 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 51, Database accession no. 1990-380013, XP002320915 & JPH02274759 A 19901108 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1-7 * abstract * |