EP1682413 - A METHOD OF WRAPPING A ROUNDED BALE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polymer Group, Inc. 9335 Harris Corners Parkway, Suite 300 Charlotte NC 28269 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Polymer Group, Inc. 9335 Harris Corners Parkway Suite 300 Charlotte NC 28269 / US | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Polymer Group, Inc. 4055 Faber Place Drive, Suite 201 North Charleston, SC 29405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORT, Thomas 8240 Windsor Valley North Little Rock, AR 72116 / US | 02 /
FLICK, James 13465 West Links LN Wichita Kansas 67235 / US | 03 /
DEWEESE, Mike 17420 North Broadway Kingman, KS 67068 / US | 04 /
HENRIE, Lyndie 593 Flint Street Kaysville, Utah 84037 / US | 05 /
MCCABE, Gregg 2444 N. Diamont Ln. Kingmann, KS 67068 / US | 06 /
SCHMIDT, Paul 23618 South Dean Road Pretty Prairie, KS 67570 / US | 07 /
CARTER, Nick 121 West 14th Hutchinson, Kansas 67501 / US | [2007/30] |
Former [2006/40] | 01 /
DORT, Thomas 8240 Windsor Valley North Little Rock, AR 72116 / US | ||
02 /
FLICK, James 13465 West Links LN Wichita Kansas 67235 / US | |||
03 /
DEWEESE, Mike 17420 North Broadway Kingman, KS 67068 / US | |||
04 /
HENRIE, Lyndie 593 Flint Street Kaysville, Utah 84037 / US | |||
05 /
MCCABE, Gregg 2444 N. Diamont Ln. Kingmann, KS 67068 / US | |||
06 /
SCHMIDT, Paul 23618 South Dean Road Pretty Prairie, KS 67570 / US | |||
07 /
CARTER, Nick 132 Dannyn Grove Court Mooresville, NC 28115 / US | |||
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
DORT, Thomas 8240 Windsor Valley North Little Rock, AR 72116 / US | ||
02 /
FLICK, James / US | |||
03 /
DEWEESE, Mike / US | |||
04 /
HENRIE, Lyndie / US | |||
05 /
MCCABE, Gregg / US | |||
06 /
SCHMIDT, Paul 23618 South Dean Road Pretty Prairie, KS 67570 / US | |||
07 /
CARTER, Nick 132 Dannyn Grove Court Mooresville, NC 28115 / US | Representative(s) | Dorna, Peter, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Dorna, Peter, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04796108.1 | 22.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004US35057 | Priority number, date | US20030513277P | 22.10.2003 Original published format: US 513277 P | US20030513346P | 22.10.2003 Original published format: US 513346 P | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005042353 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1682413 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/08 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B65B27/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GR, IE [2007/05] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BINDEN EINES RUNDBALLENS | [2006/30] | English: | A METHOD OF WRAPPING A ROUNDED BALE | [2006/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE BALLE RONDE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 03.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US585242 ; | [A]US1937468 (TALBOT WILLIAM F); | [A]US4917008 (VAN DEN WILDENBERG LEONARDUS J [NL]); | [X]US5385002 (CUNDALL DAVID J [GB]) |