18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
28.06.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
22.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
15.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
20.07.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
13.07.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.07.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.03.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.12.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.01.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
03.08.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.07.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
14.05.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
01.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.03.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.11.2008 |
First examination report |
|
17.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
22.02.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
22.02.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
23.01.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
23.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.04.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
23.03.2007 |
Publication of international search report |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
29.12.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] |
21.07.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
21.07.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
21.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|