Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009123649 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6155608 | 02.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008021274 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A3 | WO2008021274 | 21.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71254807 | 28.02.2007 | US83720106 | 10.08.2006 | US71224107 | 28.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007100914 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007100914 | 07.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05405 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007100912 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007100912 | 07.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05403 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050640 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2007 | A3 | WO2007050640 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050629 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007050629 | 03.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007021772 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2009 | A3 | WO2007021772 | 12.04.2007 | A9 | WO2007021772 | 22.02.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70670405 | 09.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006047640 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2006 | A3 | WO2006047640 | 04.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006047541 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2006 | A3 | WO2006047541 | 04.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006020928 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2007 | B1 | WO2006020928 | 01.03.2007 | A3 | WO2006020928 | 23.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006020531 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2006 | A3 | WO2006020531 | 23.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005041793 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2005 | A3 | WO2005041793 | 12.05.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004049915 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2004 | A3 | WO2004049915 | 17.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03088878 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0160270 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2002 | A9 | WO0160270 | 23.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0160264 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2001 | A8 | WO0160264 | 23.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78253401 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0160263 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0160262 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2002 | A9 | WO0160262 | 23.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0160234 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2002 | A3 | WO0160234 | 23.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0160232 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2002 | A9 | WO0160232 | 07.03.2002 | A3 | WO0160232 | 23.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE40017E | Global Dossier | 22.01.2008 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US69381003 | 23.10.2003 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US46022399 | 13.12.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE39883E | Global Dossier | 16.10.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US67716803 | 02.10.2003 | US42060399 | 19.10.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE39860E | Global Dossier | 25.09.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US46022199 | 13.12.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | US67716703 | 02.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014025117 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314033800 | 23.09.2013 | US201113182356 | 13.07.2011 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97173104 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8709087 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2014 | B2 | US2013018473 | 17.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85637210 | 13.08.2010 | US201213612573 | 12.09.2012 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US201213342868 | 03.01.2012 | US95623607 | 13.12.2007 | US43084103 | 06.05.2003 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8523918 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2013 | B2 | US2013013000 | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33993208 | 19.12.2008 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US20265505 | 13.08.2005 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US201213617030 | 14.09.2012 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US85171310 | 06.08.2010 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8317867 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2012 | B2 | US2012123543 | 17.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85637210 | 13.08.2010 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US95623607 | 13.12.2007 | US201213342868 | 03.01.2012 | US43084103 | 06.05.2003 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011270312 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113182356 | 13.07.2011 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97173104 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8308777 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2012 | B2 | US2011060369 | 10.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97207704 | 22.10.2004 | US36739709 | 06.02.2009 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US87000010 | 27.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8167947 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2012 | B2 | US2011035005 | 10.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33993208 | 19.12.2008 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US20265505 | 13.08.2005 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US82128610 | 23.06.2010 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8328847 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2012 | B2 | US2011029019 | 03.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33993208 | 19.12.2008 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US20265505 | 13.08.2005 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US85171310 | 06.08.2010 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8105365 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2012 | B2 | US2010305617 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85637210 | 13.08.2010 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US95623607 | 13.12.2007 | US43084103 | 06.05.2003 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010145462 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | US64893809 | 29.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8328846 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2012 | B2 | US2010137991 | 03.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | US64875809 | 29.12.2009 | US6155608 | 02.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8292928 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2012 | B2 | US2010004690 | 07.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US56119209 | 16.09.2009 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009292287 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US53467309 | 03.08.2009 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US85347604 | 25.05.2004 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009270902 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US49012209 | 23.06.2009 | US97229904 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009240293 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US47379109 | 28.05.2009 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US38645106 | 21.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8034055 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2011 | B2 | US2009234399 | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46022299 | 13.12.1999 | US46293406 | 07.08.2006 | US47399909 | 28.05.2009 | US45914903 | 10.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7914535 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2011 | B2 | US2009143809 | 04.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97207704 | 22.10.2004 | US36739709 | 06.02.2009 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009124859 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35604009 | 19.01.2009 | US97206504 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009105768 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33993208 | 19.12.2008 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8088147 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2012 | B2 | US2008262502 | 23.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | US6155608 | 02.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008195156 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US4490108 | 07.03.2008 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7905908 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2008188895 | 07.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US98133107 | 31.10.2007 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008154275 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4633508 | 11.03.2008 | US97206504 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008097452 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95372407 | 10.12.2007 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97176504 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7794463 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2010 | B2 | US2008091199 | 17.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US95623607 | 13.12.2007 | US43084103 | 06.05.2003 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7799033 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2010 | B2 | US2008071282 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97178004 | 22.10.2004 | US94248807 | 19.11.2007 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008071278 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97178004 | 22.10.2004 | US94254707 | 19.11.2007 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7763025 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2010 | B2 | US2008065094 | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94020807 | 14.11.2007 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97177904 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7799032 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2010 | B2 | US2008065093 | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94026507 | 14.11.2007 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97177904 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008065092 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94025207 | 14.11.2007 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97177904 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008065080 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97178004 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US94247007 | 19.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7905905 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2008065076 | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US98141307 | 31.10.2007 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008033466 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89168607 | 10.08.2007 | US71254807 | 28.02.2007 | US83720106 | 10.08.2006 | US71224107 | 28.02.2007 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008004707 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97177504 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97178004 | 22.10.2004 | US97178104 | 22.10.2004 | US97206504 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97177904 | 22.10.2004 | US97173104 | 22.10.2004 | US97176504 | 22.10.2004 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US97207704 | 22.10.2004 | US89989007 | 07.09.2007 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US97229904 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7632274 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2009 | B2 | US2007265652 | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US97207704 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | US71224107 | 28.02.2007 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007260270 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US71254807 | 28.02.2007 | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US97207704 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7744599 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2010 | B2 | US2007233260 | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99070504 | 17.11.2004 | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US76266907 | 13.06.2007 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7727263 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2010 | B2 | US2007233099 | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99070504 | 17.11.2004 | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US76264607 | 13.06.2007 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7776068 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2010 | B2 | US2007168036 | 19.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8038680 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2011 | B2 | US2007167951 | 19.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007066977 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70670405 | 09.08.2005 | US97206504 | 22.10.2004 | US50135106 | 09.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7641657 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2010 | B2 | US2007055260 | 08.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46293406 | 07.08.2006 | US45914903 | 10.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7547317 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2009 | B2 | US2007010717 | 11.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US38645106 | 21.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006264957 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46089206 | 28.07.2006 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78253401 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006206209 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97177504 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97178004 | 22.10.2004 | US97178104 | 22.10.2004 | US97206504 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97173104 | 22.10.2004 | US97176504 | 22.10.2004 | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US97207704 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US97229904 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7938836 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2011 | B2 | US2006155297 | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7601171 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2009 | B2 | US2006079898 | 13.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7776042 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2010 | B2 | US2006058800 | 16.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US20265505 | 13.08.2005 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7608077 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2009 | B2 | US2005261695 | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7588574 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2009 | B2 | US2005165406 | 28.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97178004 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7547324 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2009 | B2 | US2005149191 | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005149049 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97206504 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7500977 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2009 | B2 | US2005149034 | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97207704 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7530993 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2009 | B2 | US2005137612 | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97177904 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005137607 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97229904 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7740633 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2010 | B2 | US2005137605 | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97178104 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005137604 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97177504 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7473256 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2009 | B2 | US2005137602 | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97176504 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8052613 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2011 | B2 | US2005137601 | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US97173104 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7662173 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2010 | B2 | US2005113929 | 26.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7491236 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2009 | B2 | US2005113928 | 26.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7717958 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2010 | B2 | US2005113919 | 26.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7329259 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2008 | B2 | US2005070908 | 31.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99070504 | 17.11.2004 | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7569056 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2009 | B2 | US2004220577 | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US85347604 | 25.05.2004 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7087058 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2006 | B2 | US2003229353 | 11.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US45914903 | 10.06.2003 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003204189 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US43075103 | 08.05.2003 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7309338 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2007 | B2 | US2003195518 | 16.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US43084103 | 06.05.2003 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090043472 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080111461 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080083265 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080080505 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080042861 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US70670405 | 09.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070091116 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04281232 | Global Dossier | 06.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5408680B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2014 | B2 | JP2011516149 | 26.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US59720 | 09.04.2008 | US6155608 | 02.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009528137 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05405 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009528136 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05403 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009512538 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | WO2006US41535 | 24.10.2006 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009512537 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41522 | 24.10.2006 | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009504261 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US70670405 | 09.08.2005 | WO2006US31084 | 09.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008517675 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US38669 | 25.10.2005 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008517672 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | WO2005US38444 | 24.10.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4993500B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2012 | B2 | JP2008509753 | 03.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US28847 | 15.08.2005 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008508980 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005US27997 | 08.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007516738 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35269 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4703084B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2011 | B2 | JP2004516855 | 10.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104754 | 14.02.2001 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4726377B | Global Dossier | 20.07.2011 | B2 | JP2003531648 | 28.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | US0104746 | 14.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4385242B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2009 | B2 | JP2003522588 | 29.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104610 | 14.02.2001 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4340834B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2009 | B2 | JP2003522586 | 29.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0104790 | 14.02.2001 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78253401 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4292360B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2009 | B2 | JP2003522585 | 29.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104744 | 14.02.2001 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4352204B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2009 | B2 | JP2003522575 | 29.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | US0104603 | 14.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2305155 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2015 | A3 | EP2305155 | 06.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04796283 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2296564 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | A4 | EP2296564 | 23.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US59720 | 09.04.2008 | US6155608 | 02.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2223663 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | B1 | EP2223663 | 01.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | EP01909230 | 14.02.2001 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2056721 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71254807 | 28.02.2007 | US83720106 | 10.08.2006 | WO2007US17851 | 10.08.2007 | US71224107 | 28.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1996081 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05405 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1993448 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05403 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1945115 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41522 | 24.10.2006 | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1945114 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | WO2006US41535 | 24.10.2006 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1922000 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2009 | A4 | EP1922000 | 21.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70670405 | 09.08.2005 | WO2006US31084 | 09.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1824421 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US38669 | 25.10.2005 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1814494 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | WO2005US38444 | 24.10.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1786341 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2011 | B1 | EP1786341 | 10.03.2010 | A4 | EP1786341 | 23.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US28847 | 15.08.2005 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1781218 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005US27997 | 08.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1694228 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2011 | B1 | EP1694228 | 30.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | WO2004US34888 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578315 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2011 | B2 | EP1578315 | 18.06.2008 | B1 | EP1578315 | 05.07.2006 | A4 | EP1578315 | 28.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1501455 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2010 | A4 | EP1501455 | 02.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0312191 | 18.04.2003 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1265541 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2008 | B1 | EP1265541 | 10.05.2006 | A4 | EP1265541 | 18.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104610 | 14.02.2001 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1265538 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2008 | A4 | EP1265538 | 18.12.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | US0104603 | 14.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1257217 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2008 | B1 | EP1257217 | 24.05.2006 | A4 | EP1257217 | 20.11.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104754 | 14.02.2001 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1257213 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A4 | EP1257213 | 20.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0104790 | 14.02.2001 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78253401 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1257212 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2012 | B9 | EP1257212 | 02.09.2009 | B1 | EP1257212 | 16.08.2006 | A4 | EP1257212 | 20.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | US0104746 | 14.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1257210 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2007 | A4 | EP1257210 | 20.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104744 | 14.02.2001 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0727775 | Global Dossier | 03.11.1999 | B1 | EP0727775 | 18.09.1996 | A3 | EP0727775 | 21.08.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP91307202 | 06.08.1991 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0470807 | Global Dossier | 09.04.1997 | B1 | EP0470807 | 12.02.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3976301 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | US0104603 | 14.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3828401 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0104790 | 14.02.2001 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78253401 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3826401 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104754 | 14.02.2001 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3826001 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104744 | 14.02.2001 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3820501 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104610 | 14.02.2001 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3700801 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | US0104746 | 14.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007284635 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71254807 | 28.02.2007 | US83720106 | 10.08.2006 | WO2007US17851 | 10.08.2007 | US71224107 | 28.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007220994 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05405 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007220992 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05403 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006306302 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41522 | 24.10.2006 | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006306225 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | WO2006US41535 | 24.10.2006 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006279969 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70670405 | 09.08.2005 | WO2006US31084 | 09.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005299446 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | WO2005US38444 | 24.10.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005299356 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US38669 | 25.10.2005 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005272596B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2010 | B2 | AU2005272596 | 23.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US28847 | 15.08.2005 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004283727 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35269 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003293241 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2004 | A8 | AU2003293241 | 23.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | US0338288 | 02.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003262387 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0312191 | 18.04.2003 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1691848 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2012 | B1 | EP1691848 | 26.03.2008 | A4 | EP1691848 | 23.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35269 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE383117T | 15.01.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE398423T | 15.07.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE415132T | 15.12.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE441375T | 15.09.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | US0104746 | 14.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE536822T | 15.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US28847 | 15.08.2005 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE553711T | 15.05.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2543295 | 06.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35269 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2576660 | 23.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005US27997 | 08.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2577071 | 23.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US28847 | 15.08.2005 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2585124 | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | WO2005US38444 | 24.10.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2585463 | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US38669 | 25.10.2005 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2617932 | 22.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70670405 | 09.08.2005 | WO2006US31084 | 09.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2627030 | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | WO2006US41535 | 24.10.2006 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2627167 | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US41522 | 24.10.2006 | US25681005 | 24.10.2005 | US25961405 | 25.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2644160 | 07.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05403 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2644196 | 07.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58633806 | 24.10.2006 | WO2007US05405 | 28.02.2007 | US58648606 | 24.10.2006 | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2700130 | 21.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71254807 | 28.02.2007 | US83720106 | 10.08.2006 | WO2007US17851 | 10.08.2007 | US71224107 | 28.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101410065 | 15.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101437457 | 20.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US77803506 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60132304T | 02.01.2009 | T2 | DE60132304D1 | 21.02.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104754 | 14.02.2001 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60136690D1 | 08.01.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104610 | 14.02.2001 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60139760D1 | 15.10.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | US0104746 | 14.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60321720D1 | 31.07.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69125543T | 13.11.1997 | T2 | DE69125543D1 | 15.05.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69131770T | 09.03.2000 | T2 | DE69131770D1 | 09.12.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1257217T | 19.05.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104754 | 14.02.2001 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1265541T | 16.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US0104610 | 14.02.2001 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1578315T | 06.10.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2299475T | 01.06.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2308014T | 16.03.2012 | T5 | ES2308014T | 01.12.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | US0338288 | 02.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2316435T | 16.04.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2626205B | 02.07.1997 | B2 | JPH0495224 | 27.03.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3019870B | 13.03.2000 | B2 | JPH04157635 | 29.05.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO326371B | 17.11.2008 | B1 | NO20053254L | 01.09.2005 | L | NO20053254D0 | 01.07.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | US0338288 | 02.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20062121L | 18.07.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2004US35269 | 22.10.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO327821B | 05.10.2009 | B1 | NO20062338L | 24.07.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | WO2004US34888 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20071286L | 09.05.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | US59998904 | 09.08.2004 | WO2005US27997 | 08.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20071350L | 04.05.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2005US28847 | 15.08.2005 | US60184204 | 14.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20072531L | 23.07.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | US97203904 | 22.10.2004 | US62114804 | 22.10.2004 | US97217604 | 22.10.2004 | US97204004 | 22.10.2004 | US97218404 | 22.10.2004 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | WO2005US38444 | 24.10.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20072550L | 18.07.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2005US38669 | 25.10.2005 | US19954105 | 08.08.2005 | US62173004 | 25.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20081011L | 06.05.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | US70670405 | 09.08.2005 | WO2006US31084 | 09.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20091290L | 24.07.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | US55806904 | 31.03.2004 | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | WO2004US34888 | 22.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG43229 | 17.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6558390 | 06.05.2003 | B2 | US2001049527 | 06.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7014633 | 21.03.2006 | B2 | US2002016583 | 07.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6899716 | 31.05.2005 | B2 | US2002173796 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6921403 | 26.07.2005 | B2 | US2003158557 | 21.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12577102 | 18.04.2002 | US18994305 | 26.07.2005 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78258301 | 13.02.2001 | US84855601 | 03.05.2001 | US30941602 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003191474 | 09.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US78253401 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5235581 | 10.08.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6558386 | 06.05.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US68482000 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6575979 | 10.06.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US64022200 | 16.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6740090 | 25.05.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6790210 | 14.09.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US70910500 | 10.11.2000 | US18274800 | 16.02.2000 | US71036900 | 10.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE36445E | 14.12.1999 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US46022199 | 13.12.1999 | US46022299 | 13.12.1999 | US46022399 | 13.12.1999 | US42060399 | 19.10.1999 | US60982999 | 22.11.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | US60969999 | 22.11.1999 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE39447E | 26.12.2006 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | US60969999 | 22.11.1999 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE40133E | 04.03.2008 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US46022199 | 13.12.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE40229E | 08.04.2008 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US46022299 | 13.12.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE40908E | 08.09.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US60982999 | 22.11.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE41918E | 09.11.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US46022399 | 13.12.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE41928E | 16.11.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | US74062991 | 05.08.1991 | US39698195 | 01.03.1995 | US42060399 | 19.10.1999 | JP4479891 | 11.03.1991 | JP21253790 | 09.08.1990 | JP28500690 | 22.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005039651 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A3 | WO2005039651 | 06.05.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060132588 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014147783 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011078797 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US51389903 | 23.10.2003 | Type | Divisional application | EP2305155 |